EP3426068 - PERSONAL CHARGING CASE FOR ELECTRONIC VAPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YERKIC-HUSEJNOVIC, Berina 9509 Meadowview Road Richmond, Virginia 23294 / US | 02 /
BACHE, Terry 601 East Jackson Street Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US | 03 /
HAWES, Eric 14207 Lander Road Midlothian, Virginia 23113 / US | 04 /
SCHIFF, David 213 Valentine Street Highland Park, New Jersey 08904 / US | 05 /
MITCHELL, Edward 302 Tower Drive Edgewater, New Jersey 07020 / US | 06 /
PHELAN, Chris 223 Harvard Street Collingswood, New Jersey 08108 / US | 07 /
ZERWECK, Jason 601 East Jackson Street Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US | 08 /
GATTA, Tony 9508 Northeast Avenue Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19115 / US | [2020/18] |
Former [2019/03] | 01 /
YERKIC-HUSEJNOVIC, Berina 9509 Meadowview Road Richmond, Virginia 23294 / US | ||
02 /
BACHE, Terry 206 Roseneath Road Richmond, Virginia 23221 / US | |||
03 /
HAWES, Eric 14207 Lander Road Midlothian, Virginia 23113 / US | |||
04 /
SCHIFF, David 213 Valentine Street Highland Park, New Jersey 08904 / US | |||
05 /
MITCHELL, Edward 302 Tower Drive Edgewater, New Jersey 07020 / US | |||
06 /
PHELAN, Chris 223 Harvard Street Collingswood, New Jersey 08108 / US | |||
07 /
ZERWECK, Jason 300 S. Olive Street Media, Pennsylvania 19063 / US | |||
08 /
GATTA, Tony 9508 Northeast Avenue Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19115 / US | Representative(s) | Dowling, Ian Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2019/03] | Application number, filing date | 17712042.5 | 10.03.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017EP55682 | Priority number, date | US201615067323 | 11.03.2016 Original published format: US201615067323 | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017153577 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3426068 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3426068 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A24F15/18, A24F47/00 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
A24F40/95 (EP,KR,US);
A24F15/01 (KR);
A24F15/18 (KR,RU);
A24F40/40 (KR);
H02J7/00 (US);
H02J7/0045 (KR,US);
H02J7/0048 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERSÖNLICHES LADEGEHÄUSE FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE VAPING-VORRICHTUNG | [2019/03] | English: | PERSONAL CHARGING CASE FOR ELECTRONIC VAPING DEVICE | [2019/03] | French: | BOÎTIER DE CHARGEMENT PERSONNEL POUR DISPOSITIF DE VAPOTAGE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2019/03] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 21.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 11.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2017 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | ES | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2012227753 (NEWTON KYLE D [US]) [X] 1-5,10,12,13,18-20 * paragraphs [0026] , [0034]; figures 1A-1E,5A,5B *; | [X]US2014053858 (LIU QIUMING [CN]) [X] 1,2,4,13,18-20 * paragraphs [0041] , [0043]; figures 3,7,8 *; | [X]WO2015023996 (LOEC INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,13,18-20 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051]; figures 2,5 *; | [X]US2015059785 (LIU QIUMING [CN]) [X] 1,13,18 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058]; figure 8 *; | [X]WO2015058341 (KIMREE HI TECH INC) [X] 1,13,18* abstract *; | [X]WO2015175713 (LOEC INC [US]) [X] 1,13,18 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035]; figure 3 *; | [X]WO2016012811 (NICOVENTURES HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,10,12,13,18-20 * page 12 - page 13; figures 7,8,9a,9B,14,15,16,18,20,23,24,25 *; | [X]GB2528712 (NICOVENTURES HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,10,12,13,18-20 * page 11, line 21 - page 12, line 19; figures 8,9A,9B * | by applicant | US2013192623 |