EP3453132 - SOUNDING REFERENCE SIGNALS WITH COLLISIONS IN ASYMMETRIC CARRIER AGGREGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICO ALVARINO, Alberto c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Wanshi c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
GAAL, Peter c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
SUN, Jing c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
XU, Hao c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
YERRAMALLI, Srinivas c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORTED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/33] |
Former [2019/11] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17719413.1 | 05.04.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017US26166 | Priority number, date | US201662333035P | 06.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662333035 P | US201715479113 | 04.04.2017 Original published format: US201715479113 | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017192232 | Date: | 09.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453132 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3453132 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W56/00 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0051 (KR);
H04L5/0044 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/14 (CN,US);
H04W56/00 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/0446 (CN,US);
H04W72/21 (KR);
H04W8/24 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALLREFERENZSIGNALE MIT KOLLISIONEN IN ASYMMETRISCHER TRÄGERAGGREGATION | [2019/11] | English: | SOUNDING REFERENCE SIGNALS WITH COLLISIONS IN ASYMMETRIC CARRIER AGGREGATION | [2019/11] | French: | SIGNAUX DE RÉFÉRENCE DE SONDAGE AVEC COLLISIONS DANS UNE AGRÉGATION DE PORTEUSES ASYMÉTRIQUES | [2019/11] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 23.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21185580.4 / EP3917063 | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.04.2017 | AL | 18.08.2021 | AT | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | CZ | 18.08.2021 | DK | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | FI | 18.08.2021 | HR | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MC | 18.08.2021 | MK | 18.08.2021 | MT | 18.08.2021 | PL | 18.08.2021 | RO | 18.08.2021 | RS | 18.08.2021 | SI | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | SM | 18.08.2021 | TR | 18.08.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | NO | 18.11.2021 | GR | 19.11.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | PT | 20.12.2021 | IE | 05.04.2022 | LU | 05.04.2022 | BE | 30.04.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 05.04.2017 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
MK | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
TR | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 05.04.2022 | ||
LU | 05.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 05.04.2017 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
MK | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 05.04.2022 | ||
LU | 05.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 05.04.2017 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 05.04.2022 | ||
LU | 05.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 05.04.2017 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 05.04.2022 | ||
LU | 05.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 05.04.2022 | ||
LU | 05.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
LU | 05.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
LU | 05.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2013010659 (CHEN WANSHI [US], et al); | [X]WO2014109686 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); |