Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468930

EP3468930 - FRICTION MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rockwool International A/S
Hovedgaden 584
2640 Hedehusene / DK
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / PERSOON, Fernao Joseph Cornelis
P.O. Box 1160
NL-6040 KD Roermond / NL
02 / HEBBEN, Roel Mathijs Johannes
P.O. Box 1160
NL-6040 KD Roermond / NL
03 / SANTAMARIA RAZO, Diego Adolfo
Piuslaan 159
5643 PB Eindhoven / NL
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17728570.709.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP64128
Priority number, dateEP2016017407410.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16174074
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212029
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468930
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C03C13/00, C08K7/04, F16D69/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:REIBUNGSMATERIAL[2019/16]
English:FRICTION MATERIAL[2019/16]
French:MATÉRIAU DE FRICTION[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase13.11.2018National basic fee paid 
13.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
13.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2012085211  (ROCKWOOL INT [DK], et al) [X] 1,3-16 * claim 1 * * page 5, line 21 - line 30 * * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 6 * * page 13, line 3 - line 19 * * page 17, line 8 - line 31 * [I] 2;
 [A]US2013228403  (KIKUDOME TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2015041241  (AKEBONO BRAKE IND [JP]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2011042533
 WO2011131761
 US4994506
    - HAMEED, R.; TURATSINZE, A.; DUPRAT, F.; SELLIER, A., "Metallic fiber reinforced concrete: effect of fiber aspect ratio on the flexural properties", ARPN JOURNAL OF ENGINEERING AND APPLIED SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 4, no. 5
 WO2016EP56172