EP3484339 - ADAPTOR FOR MULTIPLE TYPES OF ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cook Medical Technologies LLC 750 North Daniels Way Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENN, Niall 6 Coolbawns Meadows Castleconnell County Limerick / IE | 02 /
COLLINS, Aaron Ballinaguille Croagh County Limerick / IE | 03 /
CLANCY, Michael S. 31 Oakfield Monaleen County Limerick / IE | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/21] | Simpson, Tobias Rutger, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17743148.3 | 12.07.2017 | [2019/21] | WO2017US41674 | Priority number, date | US201662361816P | 13.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662361816 P | [2019/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018013660 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3484339 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
A61B1/00128 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/00121 (KR,US);
A61B1/00137 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/00006 (KR);
A61B1/00114 (KR,US);
A61B1/00133 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Title | German: | ADAPTER FÜR MEHRERE ARTEN VON ENDOSKOPEN | [2019/21] | English: | ADAPTOR FOR MULTIPLE TYPES OF ENDOSCOPE | [2019/21] | French: | ADAPTATEUR POUR MULTIPLES TYPES D'ENDOSCOPE | [2019/21] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 24.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006276688 (SURTI VIHAR C [US]) [X] 1,14 * figure 8 *; | [I]US2009088600 (MELOUL RAPHAEL [IL]) [I] 1,5-14,16-20* figure 4 *; | [X]US2016121095 (MAURICE JR DANIEL G [US]) [X] 1-4,14,15 * figure 6 * |