blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3494199

EP3494199 - THERMOCLEAVABLE FRICTION MODIFIERS AND METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.06.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.02.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2021Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.07.2021  [2021/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rutgers, the State University of New Jersey
Old Queens Building
Somerset and George Streets
New Brunswick, NJ 08901 / US
For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
[2019/24]
Inventor(s)01 / UHRICH, Kathryn
1812 Jessie Ann Court
Conroe, Texas 77304 / US
02 / FAIG, Jonathan
1812 Jessie Ann Court
Conroe, Texas 77304 / US
03 / ZHANG, Yingyue
1812 Jessie Ann Court
Conroe, Texas 77304 / US
04 / LUO, Shuji
1812 Jessie Ann Court
Conroe, Texas 77304 / US
05 / NG, Man Kit
1812 Jessie Ann Court
Conroe, Texas 77304 / US
06 / SCHILOWITZ, Alan
1812 Jessie Ann Court
Conroe, Texas 77304 / US
07 / SHOUGH, Anne, Marie
1812 Jessie Ann Court
Conroe, Texas 77304 / US
 [2019/24]
Representative(s)Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstraße 4
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/24]Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date17754907.807.08.2017
[2019/24]
WO2017US45761
Priority number, dateUS201662371580P05.08.2016         Original published format: US 201662371580 P
[2019/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018027227
Date:08.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3494199
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.02.2018
ClassificationIPC:C10M129/42, C10M129/72
[2019/24]
CPC:
C10M129/42 (EP,US); C10M169/04 (US); C07C69/02 (US);
C07C69/533 (US); C07C69/612 (US); C07C69/708 (US);
C10M129/72 (EP,US); C10M129/76 (EP,US); C10M2203/003 (US);
C10M2207/123 (EP,US); C10M2207/124 (EP,US); C10M2207/127 (EP,US);
C10M2207/128 (EP,US); C10M2207/282 (EP,US); C10M2207/284 (US);
C10M2207/288 (EP,US); C10N2030/06 (EP,US); C10N2030/54 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/24]
Extension statesBA22.02.2019
ME22.02.2019
TitleGerman:WÄRMESPALTBARE REIBUNGSMODIFIKATOREN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2019/24]
English:THERMOCLEAVABLE FRICTION MODIFIERS AND METHODS THEREOF[2019/24]
French:MODIFICATEURS DE FRICTION THERMOCLIVABLES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS[2019/24]
Entry into regional phase22.02.2019National basic fee paid 
22.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
22.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/24]
22.02.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.03.2021Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2021/30]
19.03.2021Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2021/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.202004   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US2006183647  (KOCSIS JODY [US], et al) [A] 1-6,8-50,74-83,85-107 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0027] , [0030] - [0034] - [0036] * * paragraphs [0076] - [0084]; tables I,II *;
 [XI]WO2012056191  (CASTROL LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8,13,16,20-24,29,32,36-40,44-51,53,54,61,62,64,74-78,80,81,88-90,94-96,100-107 * page 3, line 26 - page 5, line 30 * * page 7, lines 26-32 * * page 9, lines 2-10,23-26 * * page 10, line 22 - page 11, line 1 * * Table 9, 'Expt. W' and 'Example 9'; page 44, line 1 - page 45, line 6; claims 1,4,21,22 * [I] 1-6,8-50,59,67-70,74-83,85-108;
 [X]US2016068467  (UHRICH KATHRYN E [US], et al) [X] 51,53,58,62,64,71 * Figure 2, compounds 3 and 4; Figure 2, preparation of compounds 6; paragraphs [0108] - [0115] - [ 0134] *;
 [X]  - ALLISON FAIG ET AL, "Impact of Hydrophobic Chain Composition on Amphiphilic Macromolecule Antiatherogenic Bioactivity", BIOMACROMOLECULES, (20140908), vol. 15, no. 9, doi:10.1021/bm500809f, ISSN 1525-7797, pages 3328 - 3337, XP055416263 [X] 51,54,65,66,71,73 * page 3330, paragraph 2.3.5 * * Scheme 2, compounds 6a and 6c and their preparation *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bm500809f
 [X]  - ZHANG YINGYUE ET AL, "Micellar and structural stability of nanoscale amphiphilic polymers: Implications for anti-atherosclerotic bioactivity", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (20160106), vol. 84, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2015.12.028, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 230 - 240, XP029418104 [X] 51,62,64 * Scheme 1, compound DTT(12-O); page 235 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2015.12.028
 [X]  - MAKI T ET AL, "Catalytic monoalkylation of 1,2-diols", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 50, no. 13, doi:10.1016/J.TETLET.2009.01.063, ISSN 0040-4039, (20090401), pages 1466 - 1468, (20090119), XP025936989 [X] 51,53,58,62,64 * compound 3a on page 1466; compound 10 on page 1467 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2009.01.063
 [XI]  - TOKUZO KAWASE ET AL, "Monolayer Behavior of Asymmetrical Ester-type Tartaric Gemini Amphiphiles", JOURNAL OF OLEO SCIENCE, JP, (20130101), vol. 62, no. 6, doi:10.5650/jos.62.371, ISSN 1345-8957, pages 371 - 380, XP055416162 [X] 51,53-55,57,60,61,63 * page 373, paragraph 2.2.2.3 * * Scheme 1, compounds 3 and 4; page 374, paragraph 3.1 * * Scheme 1, preparation of compound 4 from compound 1 * [I] 72

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.5650/jos.62.371
 [X]  - TOKUZO KAWASE ET AL, "Effects of Hydrophobic Chain Length on Temperature Dependence of Monolayer Behavior of Ester-type Tartaric Geminis", JOURNAL OF OLEO SCIENCE, JP, (20110101), vol. 60, no. 2, doi:10.5650/jos.60.61, ISSN 1345-8957, pages 61 - 69, XP055416163 [X] 51,53,55,57,60,61,63-66 * page 62, paragraph 2.2.2.1. 2.2.2.2 * * Scheme 1, compounds 2 and 3; page 64 * * Page 65, left-hand column, line 1, definition of alkanoyl group *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.5650/jos.60.61
by applicantUS1815022
 US2015748
 US2100993
 US2191498
 US2387501
 US2655479
 US2666746
 US2721877
 US2721878
 US2817693
 US3036003
 US3087936
 US3172892
 US3200107
 US3215707
 US3219666
 US3250715
 US3254025
 US3272746
 US3275554
 US3316177
 US3322670
 US3329658
 US3341542
 US3382291
 US3413347
 US3438757
 US3444170
 US3449250
 US3454607
 US3454555
 US3519565
 US3541012
 US3565804
 US3595791
 US3630904
 US3632511
 US3652616
 US3666730
 US3687849
 US3697574
 US3702300
 US3703536
 US3704308
 US3725277
 US3725480
 US3726882
 US3742082
 US3751365
 US3755433
 US3756953
 US3769363
 US3787374
 US3798165
 US3803039
 GB1350257
 US3822209
 US3876720
 GB1390359
 GB1429494
 US3948800
 GB1440230
 US4100082
 US4149178
 US4218330
 US4234435
 US4239930
 CA1094044
 US4367352
 US4413156
 US4426305
 US4434408
 US4454059
 US4594172
 US4767551
 US4798684
 US4827064
 US4827073
 US4897178
 US4910355
 US4921594
 US4943672
 US4952739
 US4956122
 US4975177
 US5068487
 US5075269
 EP0464546
 EP0464547
 US5084197
 EP0471071
 US5430105
 US5705458
 US6034039
 US6080301
 US6090989
 US6165949
 US6323164
 US2008020950
 US7704930
 US8048833
 US2015344805
    - FRIEDEL-CRAFTS, Related Reactions, Inter-science Publishers, (19640000), vol. 2
    - KLAMANN, Lubricants and Related Products, Verlag Chemie
    - REMMERT et al., SAE International Journal of Fuels and Lubricants, (20130000), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 677 - 690
    - TANG, Z.; LI, S., Current Opinion in Solid State and Materials Science, (20140000), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 119 - 139
    - TANG, Z.; LI, S., Current Opinion in Solid State andMaterials Science, (20140000), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 119 - 139
    - PHILLIPS et al., SAE Technical Paper, (20070000), pages 2007 - 01,4143
    - ALLEN, C. M.; DRAUGLIS, E., Wear, (19690000), vol. 14, page 363
    - HERSEY, M. D., Journal of American Society of Mechanical Engineers, (19330000), vol. 55, page 561
    - JAHANMIR, S., Wear, (19850000), vol. 102, no. 4, page 331
    - JAHANMIR, S.; BELTZER, M., Journal Of Tribology, (19860000), vol. 108, pages 109 - 116
    - BOWDEN et al., Nature, (19450000), vol. 156, pages 97 - 101
    - MINAMI, I.; MORI, S., Lubrication Science, (20070000), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 127 - 149
    - HELGESEN, M.; KREBS, F. C., Macromolecules, (20100000), vol. 43, no. 3, pages 1253 - 1260
    - PETERSON et al., Macromolecules, (20080000), vol. 41, pages 8986 - 8994
    - URAY et al., Tetrahedron, (19880000), vol. 44, no. 14, pages 4357 - 4362
    - FAIG et al., Biomacromolecules, (20140000), vol. 15, no. 9, pages 3328 - 3337
    - ZHANG et al., Biomaterials, (20160000), vol. 84, pages 230 - 240
    - MAKI et al., Tetrahedron Letters, (20090000), vol. 50, pages 1466 - 1468
    - URAY, G.; LINDNER, W., Tetrahedron, (19880000), vol. 44, no. 14, pages 4357 - 4362
    - MOLDOVNEANU, S. C., Pyrolysis of Organic Molecules: Applications to Health and Environmental Issues., Elsevier, (20100000), page 744
    - MOLDOVNEANU, S. C., Pyrolysis of Organic Molecules: Applications to Health and Environmental Issues, Elsevier, (20100000), page 744
    - RUDOLPH et al., Colloids and Surfaces A: Physicochemical and Engineering Aspects, (20120000), vol. 397, pages 16 - 23
    - ZHANG et al., Metallurgical and Materials Transactions A, (20090000), vol. 41, no. 2, pages 532 - 541
    - JAHANMIR, S.; BELTZER, M. et al., Tribology Transactions, (19860000), vol. 29, pages 423 - 430
    - STOREY et al., Macromolecules, (19980000), vol. 31, pages 1523 - 1526
    - DOGU et al., Ind. Eng. Chem. Res., (20010000), vol. 40, pages 5044 - 5051
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.