EP3427724 - COMPOSITION CONTAINING FINE PARTICLES, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Dainippon Pharma Co., Ltd. 6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8524 / JP | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITO, Shunsuke c/o Sumitomo Dainippon Pharma Co. Ltd. 3-45 Kurakakiuchi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0878 / JP | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/03] | Application number, filing date | 17763360.9 | 09.03.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017JP09428 | Priority number, date | JP20160047607 | 10.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016047607 | [2019/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017155020 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3427724 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/19, A61K9/10, A61K9/16, A61K31/405, A61K31/496, A61K31/499, A61K47/10, A61K47/14, A61K47/32, A61K47/34 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/499 (EP,US);
A61K31/405 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/14 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (US);
A61K47/32 (EP,US);
A61K47/34 (EP,US);
A61K9/10 (EP,US);
A61K9/16 (EP,US);
A61K9/1623 (US);
A61K9/1635 (US);
A61K9/1641 (US);
A61K9/19 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/04 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT FEINEN PARTIKELN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/03] | English: | COMPOSITION CONTAINING FINE PARTICLES, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2019/03] | French: | COMPOSITION CONTENANT DE FINES PARTICULES, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIÉ | [2019/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2018 | Translation filed | 08.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 29.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005072707 (HOSOKAWA POWDER TECHNOLOGY RES [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0188] - [0190]; claims 1-3,9 *; | [A]US2011237686 (NG PEI-SZE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0007] *; | [X]WO2013034926 (UNIV LIVERPOOL [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-3 *; | [X]US2013122058 (CHOW ALBERT HEE LUM [HK], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0082]; claim - *; | [A]EP2623100 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0060]; example 24 *; | [X]US2013337077 (WONG HO LUN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0076]; claim - *; | [Y]US2014328919 (ZHANG JERRY [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0125] , [0728] , [1872] , [1970] *; | [A]WO2015128685 (DARHOLDING KFT [HU]) [A] 1-15* claim - *; | [A]KR20160015335 (VYOME BIOSCIENCES PVT LTD [IN]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0046]; claim 1 *; | [Y] - FONTE PEDRO ET AL, "Facts and evidences on the lyophilization of polymeric nanoparticles for drug delivery", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160121), vol. 225, doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2016.01.034, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 75 - 86, XP029438890 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2016.01.034 | [Y] - SUZANNE M D'ADDIO ET AL, "Controlling drug nanoparticle formation by rapid precipitation", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 63, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.ADDR.2011.04.005, ISSN 0169-409X, (20110422), pages 417 - 426, (20110430), XP028374101 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2011.04.005 | [A] - SUDHIR VERMA ET AL, "Physical stability of nanosuspensions: Investigation of the role of stabilizers on Ostwald ripening", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 406, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.IJPHARM.2010.12.027, ISSN 0378-5173, (20101217), pages 145 - 152, (20101224), XP028363293 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2010.12.027 | International search | [A]JP2004175752 (NOF CORP, et al) [A] 11, 12, 32 * ), entire text (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2005298347 (KAWASHIMA YOSHIAKI, et al) [Y] 1-3, 5-10, 13-31, 33-39 * ), claim 3; paragraphs [0017], [0019], [0021], [0031], [0032], [0035], [0042], [0055]; examples 1 to 3 (Family: none) * [A] 11, 12, 32; | [A]WO2012169518 (HOSOKAWA MICRON KK [JP], et al) [A] 11, 12, 32* ), paragraph [0063] (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2014050910 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [A] 13, 14, 33-35 * ), paragraphs [0010], [0019], [0025] & US 2015/0250728 A1 & EP 2902014 A1 paragraphs [0011], [0041], [0057] *; | [YA] - YOSHIAKI KAWASHIMA, "Functional Expression of Pharmaceutical Nanoparticulates by Composition", Journal of the Society of Powder Technology, Japan, (20040000), vol. 41, no. 6, pages 418 - 423, XP055420712 [Y] 1-10, 13-31, 33-39 * , particularly, pages 419 to 420, paragraph of '2.1 Yakubutsu Nano Ryushi no Composite-ka to Sono Bussei' * [A] 11, 12, 32 | [Y] - AYAO KITAHARA et al., "Bunsan·Nyukakei no Kagaku", Kogaku Tosho Kabushiki Kaisha, (19830000), pages 56 - 61, XP9515401 [Y] 1-10, 13-31, 33-39 * , particularly, pages 57, 59, 2nd paragraph from the bottom * | [A] - Anonymous, "KURARAY POVAL", (20120117), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20120117071111/http://www.poval.jp/japan/poval/gradelist/gl_04.html, (20170327), XP055576898 [A] 1-10, 13-31, 33-39 | [A] - MASARU OYA, "[The basics and mechanism of the latest cleaning / detergent that can be easily understood: Basic knowledge of aqueous and non-aqueous cleaning and mechanical cleaning: Mechanism of dirt removal]", Zukai Nyumon Yoku Wakaru Saishin Senjo·Senzai no Kihon to Shikumi: Suikei· Hisuikei Senjo, Kikaiteki Senjo no Kiso Chishiki: Yogore Jokyo no Mechanism, (20111215), pages 142 - 143, XP009515337 [A] 16-22 | [A] - TETSUO NAKAZAWA et al., "Study on the Self- Hardening Mold Bonded by Polyvinyl Alcohol", Imono, (19830000), vol. 55, no. 5, pages 285 - 290, XP055420714 [A] 16-22 * , particularly, page 288, right column, 8th to 4th lines from the bottom * |