EP3520549 - RADIO BEARER SWITCHING IN RADIO ACCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2019/32] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDER, Andreas Erthalstr. 46 97074 Wurzburg / DE | 02 /
DECARREAU, Guillaume Sebastian Bauer Str. 16 E 81737 Munich / DE | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2019/32] | Application number, filing date | 17769113.6 | 04.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017FI50619 | Priority number, date | US201662401385P | 29.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662401385 P | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018060546 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3520549 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3520549 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L29/06, H04W28/02, H04W76/20 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
H04L69/14 (EP,BR,CN,KR,RU);
H04W28/0263 (EP,BR,CN,KR,RU,US);
H04L67/141 (EP,BR,CN,KR,RU);
H04L67/148 (EP,BR,CN,KR,RU);
H04W28/0205 (EP,BR,CN,KR,RU,US);
H04W76/15 (BR,CN,KR,RU);
|
Former IPC [2020/14] | H04L29/06, H04W28/02, H04W76/20 | ||
Former IPC [2019/32] | H04W76/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKTRÄGERUMSCHALTUNG FÜR DEN FUNKZUGANG | [2020/29] | English: | RADIO BEARER SWITCHING IN RADIO ACCESS | [2019/32] | French: | COMMUTATION DES SUPPORTS RADIO DANS UN ACCÈS RADIO | [2020/16] |
Former [2019/32] | FUNKTRÄGERUMSCHALTUNG BEI EINEM FUNKZUGANG | ||
Former [2019/32] | COMMUTATION DE SUPPORT RADIO DANS UN ACCÈS RADIO | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 25.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21151381.7 / EP3832976 | EP22207306.6 / EP4181485 | EP24160970.0 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 20.01.2021 | CY | 20.01.2021 | CZ | 20.01.2021 | HR | 20.01.2021 | LT | 20.01.2021 | LV | 20.01.2021 | MC | 20.01.2021 | RS | 20.01.2021 | SI | 20.01.2021 | SK | 20.01.2021 | SM | 20.01.2021 | BG | 20.04.2021 | NO | 20.04.2021 | IS | 20.05.2021 | LU | 04.09.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2022/34] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CZ | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | HR | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | HR | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | HR | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | HR | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HR | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | LT | 20.01.2021 | |
NO | 20.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015201046 (BISWAS ANUMITA [US]) [A] 1-53 * abstract ** paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0074] *; | [A]GB2525416 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-53 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 35 * * page 7, line 12 - page 9, line 15 * |