EP3443045 - A METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A WET GLUED WOOD ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stora Enso Oyj P.O. Box 309 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2019/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRMKE, Markus Oberarnsdorf 27 3621 Rossatz-Arnsdorf / AT | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Steinrud, Henrik Stora Enso AB Group Intellectual Property Box 9090 65009 Karlstad / SE | [2019/08] | Application number, filing date | 17782029.7 | 12.04.2017 | [2019/08] | WO2017IB52111 | Priority number, date | SE20160050506 | 15.04.2016 Original published format: SE 1650506 | [2019/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017178983 | Date: | 19.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3443045 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 19.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09J5/02, C09J161/06, C09J161/20, C09J175/04, F26B3/00, F26B5/00, B27M3/00, B32B3/26, B32B7/12, B32B21/02, B32B21/13, C09J161/12, C09J161/30, B27D1/00, B32B21/04 | [2024/34] | CPC: |
B27M3/0053 (EP,EA,US);
C09J5/02 (EP,EA,SE,US);
B27D1/00 (EP,EA,SE,US);
B32B21/02 (EP,US);
B32B21/04 (EP,EA,US);
B32B21/042 (SE);
B32B21/13 (EP,US);
B32B3/26 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
C09J161/06 (EP,EA,SE,US);
C09J161/12 (EP,EA,US);
C09J161/30 (EP,EA,US);
C09J175/04 (EP,EA,SE,US);
F26B3/00 (EP,EA,SE,US);
F26B5/00 (EP,EA,US);
B32B2250/02 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7246 (EP,US);
B32B2419/00 (EP,US);
B32B2479/00 (EP,US);
C09J161/20 (SE);
C09J2400/303 (EP,EA,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/48] | C09J5/02, C09J161/06, C09J161/20, C09J175/04, F26B3/00, F26B5/00, B27M3/00, B32B3/26, B32B7/12, B32B21/02, B32B21/13 | ||
Former IPC [2019/08] | C09J5/02, B27D1/00, B32B21/04, C09J161/06, C09J161/20, C09J175/04, F26B3/00, F26B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES NASS VERLEIMTEN HOLZGEGENSTANDES | [2019/08] | English: | A METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A WET GLUED WOOD ARTICLE | [2019/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ARTICLE EN BOIS COLLÉ PAR VOIE HUMIDE | [2019/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 11.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS57169581 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [X]JPH01238901 (EIDAI CO LTD); | [X]EP2132012 (DYNEA OY [FI]); | [X]JP2012206452 (PAL WOOD MATERIAL:KK, et al) | International search | [A]GB1164042 (HILDEBRAND ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US4239577 (BROWN TIMOTHY M [US], et al); | [A]CA2238491 (PLACEMENTS R GRENIER INC [CA]); | [A]US6007659 (HASEGAWA KATSUJI [JP]); |