EP3526812 - METHOD FOR ANISOTROPIC DEEP REACTIVE-ION ETCHING WITH A FLUORINE GAS MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/34] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ANISOTROPIC DEEP REACTIVE-ION ETCHING WITH A FLUORINE GAS MIXTURE | ||
[2020/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIELAND, Robert c/o Fraunhofer-Einrichting für Mikrosysteme und Festkörper-Technologien EMFT Hanastrasse 27d 81686 München / DE | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Hersina, Günter, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2019/34] | Application number, filing date | 17784936.1 | 16.10.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017EP76265 | Priority number, date | DE201610220248 | 17.10.2016 Original published format: DE102016220248 | [2019/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018073135 | Date: | 26.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3526812 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3526812 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/3065, B81C1/00, H01J37/32 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
H01L21/30655 (EP,KR,US);
B81C1/00619 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/32082 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/32357 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/3244 (EP,US);
H01J37/32449 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/31116 (KR);
H01L21/67069 (KR,US);
B81C2201/0112 (EP,KR,US);
H01J2237/3341 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | H01L21/3065 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANISOTROPEN DRIE-ÄTZEN MIT FLUORGASMISCHUNG | [2020/08] | English: | METHOD FOR ANISOTROPIC DEEP REACTIVE-ION ETCHING WITH A FLUORINE GAS MIXTURE | [2020/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GRAVURE IONIQUE RÉACTIVE PROFONDE ANISOTROPE FAISANT APPEL À UN MÉLANGE GAZEUX FLUORÉ | [2020/08] |
Former [2019/34] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANISOTROPEN DRIE-ÄTZEN MIT FLUORGASMISCHUNG | ||
Former [2019/34] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ANISOTROPIC DEEP REACTIVE-ION ETCHING WITH A FLUORINE GAS MIXTURE | ||
Former [2019/34] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE GRAVURE IONIQUE RÉACTIVE PROFONDE ANISOTROPE FAISANT APPEL À UN MÉLANGE GAZEUX FLUORÉ | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 17.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.10.2017 | AL | 29.07.2020 | CY | 29.07.2020 | CZ | 29.07.2020 | DK | 29.07.2020 | EE | 29.07.2020 | ES | 29.07.2020 | FI | 29.07.2020 | HR | 29.07.2020 | IT | 29.07.2020 | LT | 29.07.2020 | LV | 29.07.2020 | MC | 29.07.2020 | MK | 29.07.2020 | MT | 29.07.2020 | PL | 29.07.2020 | RO | 29.07.2020 | RS | 29.07.2020 | SE | 29.07.2020 | SI | 29.07.2020 | SK | 29.07.2020 | SM | 29.07.2020 | TR | 29.07.2020 | IE | 16.10.2020 | LU | 16.10.2020 | BG | 29.10.2020 | NO | 29.10.2020 | GR | 30.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | IS | 29.11.2020 | PT | 30.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 16.10.2017 | |
AL | 29.07.2020 | ||
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
MT | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
TR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 16.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.10.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 16.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.10.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 16.10.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 16.10.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 16.10.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 29.07.2020 | |
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | DK | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | ES | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | ES | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5501893 (LAERMER FRANZ [DE], et al) [X] 12-16,18 * column 3, line 43 - column 4; figure 1 * [I] 19; | [I]WO2009080615 (SOLVAY FLUOR GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-11 * page 2, line 12 - page 4, line 10 * * page 6, line 18 - page 9, line 27 * * examples 1,3 *; | [X] - KARL KUEHL ET AL, "Advanced silicon trench etching in MEMS applications", PROCEEDINGS OPTICAL DIAGNOSTICS OF LIVING CELLS II, US, (19980831), vol. 3511, doi:10.1117/12.324331, ISSN 0277-786X, ISBN 978-1-5106-1324-9, pages 97 - 105, XP055441716 [X] 12-17 * 2.2. Etch equipment;; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.324331 | [A] - GIRARD G ET AL, "Matrix-distributed ECR-PECVD for high-rate deposition of silica for applications in integrated optics", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING; 20-1-2004 - 20-1-2004; SAN JOSE,, (20030101), vol. 4944, doi:10.1117/12.468294, ISBN 978-1-62841-730-2, pages 62 - 71, XP002436134 [A] 19 * abstract * * paragraphs [002A] - [002D] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.468294 |