blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3548890

EP3548890 - MEANS AND METHODS FOR VISUALIZATION OF TISSUE STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.08.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.02.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  06.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 27.03.2024  [2024/13]
23.02.2024Change - applicantpublished on 27.03.2024  [2024/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gretz, Norbert
Pfalzstraße 11
68259 Mannheim / DE
For all designated states
Rudolf, Rüdiger
Karl-Menges-Str. 24
69124 Heidelberg / DE
For all designated states
Weinfurter, Stefanie
Friedberger Landstrasse 17
60316 Frankfurt am Main / DE
For all designated states
Brenna, Cinzia
Hafenstrasse 48-52
68159 Mannheim / DE
For all designated states
Huang, Jiaguo
Bürgerstrasse 37
69124 Heidelberg / DE
For all designated states
Khan, Arif ul Maula
K2, 1-2
68159 Mannheim / DE
[2024/13]
Former [2019/41]For all designated states
Gretz, Norbert
Pfalzstraße 11
68259 Mannheim / DE
For all designated states
Rudolf Rüdiger
Karl-Menges-Str. 24
69124 Heidelberg / DE
For all designated states
Weinfurter, Stefanie
Friedberger Landstrasse 17
60316 Frankfurt am Main / DE
For all designated states
Brenna, Cinzia
Hafenstrasse 48-52
68159 Mannheim / DE
For all designated states
Huang, Jiaguo
Bürgerstrasse 37
69124 Heidelberg / DE
For all designated states
Khan, Arif ul Maula
K2, 1-2
68159 Mannheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/41]
Representative(s)Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2
68165 Mannheim / DE
[2024/13]
Former [2019/41]Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date17804589.430.11.2017
[2019/41]
WO2017EP81034
Priority number, dateEP2016020168401.12.2016         Original published format: EP 16201684
[2019/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018100089
Date:07.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3548890
Date:09.10.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3548890
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.06.2018
ClassificationIPC:G01N33/50, C08G73/02, G01N33/52
[2019/41]
CPC:
G01N33/52 (EP,US); G01N1/30 (US); C08G69/08 (US);
C08G69/10 (EP); C08G73/0206 (EP,US); C09B69/105 (US);
C09K11/07 (US); G01N33/5082 (EP); G01N33/5088 (US);
C09K2211/14 (US); G01N2001/302 (US); G01N2800/7028 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR VISUALISIERUNG VON GEWEBESTRUKTUREN[2019/41]
English:MEANS AND METHODS FOR VISUALIZATION OF TISSUE STRUCTURES[2019/41]
French:MOYEN ET PROCÉDÉS DE VISUALISATION DE STRUCTURES TISSULAIRES[2023/31]
Former [2019/41]MOYENS ET PROCÉDÉS DE VISUALISATION DE STRUCTURES TISSULAIRES
Entry into regional phase29.05.2019National basic fee paid 
29.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/41]
29.05.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.02.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2023Fee for grant paid
21.12.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.12.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
24.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9708552  (FIRST MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 7, line 14 - line 20; claim - ** page 8, line 33 - page 9, line 22 *;
 [A]GB2377757  (CHIANG ANN-SHYN [TW]) [A] 1-15 * claim - *;
 [IA]WO2006102167  (UNIV STANFORD [US], et al) [I] 1-7,13-15 * claim - * * page 8, line 15 - line 21 * * page 9, line 16 - line 19 * * page 11, line 1 - line 10 * [A] 8-12;
 [A]EP1760467  (SCHERING AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * claim - *;
 [IA]US2007148094  (UZGIRIS EGIDIJUS E [US], et al) [I] 1-7,13-15 * claim - * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0116] * * figures 7A, 7B; example 11 * [A] 8-12;
 [A]WO2009114854  (EGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim - * * paragraph [0074] *;
 [IA]EP2113257  (CONSORZIO PER IL CT DI BIOMEDI [IT]) [I] 1-7,13-15 * claim - * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0063] * [A] 8-12;
 [A]WO2015164666  (AVRYGEN CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * claim - * * figures 1D, 1E *
by applicantUS2005170450
 US7863470
 US2011020927
 US8003734
 US8445025
    - LEE et al., BMV Dev Biol, (20140000), vol. 14, page 781
    - PAN et al., Nat Methods, (20160000), vol. 13, no. 10, pages 859 - 67
    - SUSAKI; UEDA, Cell Chem Biol, (20160000), vol. 23, page 137
    - MARX, Nature Methods, (20160000), vol. 13, no. 3, page 205
    - KLINGBERG et al., JASN, (20160000), vol. 28
    - THOMAS; KLIBANOV, PNAS, (20030000), vol. 100, no. 16, page 9138
    - BENNET et al., American Journal of Physiology - Renal Physiology, (20130000), vol. 304, no. 10, page F1252
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.