EP3545218 - A SEALING ARRANGEMENT FOR A ROTATABLE SHAFT OF A COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scania CV AB 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÅNGFELDT, Hans Pilkrogsvägen 27 125 41 Älvsjö / SE | 02 /
FORS, Stefan Plåtslagarvägen 86 146 36 Tullinge / SE | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Scania CV AB Patents, GP 117kv 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [2019/40] | Application number, filing date | 17809067.6 | 24.11.2017 | [2019/40] | WO2017SE51166 | Priority number, date | SE20160051554 | 28.11.2016 Original published format: SE 1651554 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018097792 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3545218 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/3276, F02F11/00 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
F16J15/3276 (EP,KR,US);
F02F11/007 (EP,KR,SE,US);
B25B27/0028 (US);
F02F2007/0063 (US);
F02N2250/08 (US);
F16C33/783 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EINE DREHBARE WELLE EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS | [2019/40] | English: | A SEALING ARRANGEMENT FOR A ROTATABLE SHAFT OF A COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2019/40] | French: | AGENCEMENT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ DESTINÉ À UN ARBRE ROTATIF D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION | [2019/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 28.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/15] | 07.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1776524 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,12 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0070]; figure 1 * [I] 3,8,9,11; | [XI]EP1910667 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,12 * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0087]; figures 3-5, 7, 8 * [I] 3,7,9; | [XI]WO2007012956 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * paragraph [0115]; figures 1-3 * [I] 3,7,9; | [XI]EP2515011 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0056]; figure 1 * [I] 3,7,9; | [XI]JP2010144827 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,2,5,12 * abstract * [I] 3,6-9 | by applicant | CN203796438U |