EP3468901 - CONVEYOR BELT WITH SIDEWALLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intralox, L.L.C. 200 Laitram Lane Harahan, Louisiana 70123 / US | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONEYCUTT, James c/o Intralox, L.L.C. 200 Laitram Lane Harahan, Louisiana 70123 / US | 02 /
MOL, Edward T. c/o Intralox, L.L.C. 200 Laitram Lane Harahan, Louisiana 70123 / US | 03 /
HENDRICKSON, Daniel c/o Intralox, L.L.C. 200 Laitram Lane Harahan, Louisiana 70123 / US | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/16] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17810666.2 | 12.04.2017 | [2019/16] | WO2017US27122 | Priority number, date | US201615177960 | 09.06.2016 Original published format: US201615177960 | [2019/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017213744 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3468901 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65G15/30, B65G15/44, B65G15/42 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
B65G15/42 (EP,US);
B65G15/40 (US);
B65G15/44 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/16] | B65G15/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Title | German: | FÖRDERBAND MIT SEITENWÄNDEN | [2019/16] | English: | CONVEYOR BELT WITH SIDEWALLS | [2019/16] | French: | BANDE TRANSPORTEUSE À PAROIS LATÉRALES | [2019/16] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 09.12.2018 | Observations by third parties | 18.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.03.2024 | 13.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2864488 (TAIPALE VICTOR K) [Y] 1-4,6-10 * column 1; figure 1 * [A] 5; | [Y]US4267921 (KELL RALPH W) [Y] 1-4,6-10 * column 1; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS61145005 (NIPPON MEKTRON KK) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9414687 (CHIORINO UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 11-15 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US6170646 (KAEB TODD [US], et al) [A] 11-15* figures 4-5 *; | [Y]EP1524211 (CONTITECH TRANSPORTBANDSYSTEME [DE]) [Y] 1-4,6-10 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2015284185 (SCHROEDER MICHAEL [US]) [A] 11-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0015]; figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [X] - Dorner, "Sanitary Vertical Belt Conveyors for Elevating Bulk Products Open Frame Tool-less Design Innovative Staggered Sidewall Belts Quick Belt Change Fast and Effective Cleaning Capability", (20150101), URL: https://d20ull5sba7jz.cloudfront.net/wp-content/uploads/2017/11/AquaPruf-VBT-Brochure-HR.pdf, (20200120), XP055659338 [X] 1-4,6,8-10 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH051713U (BANDO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.) [Y] 1-3 * See abstract, paragraph [0017], and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US6170646 (KAEB TODD [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 14-16 * See abstrat, claim 1, and figures 1-6. *; | [Y]EP1524211 (CONTITECH TRANSPORTBANDSYSTEME [DE]) [Y] 1-3, 14-16 * See abstract, paragraph [0028], claims 1, 4, and figures 1-3. *; | [A]WO2009112312 (CONTITECH TRANSPORTBANDSYSTEME [DE], et al) [A] 1-3, 14-16* See abstract, claim 1, and figure 1. *; | [Y]US2016031650 (PETERSEN BRIAN JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 14-16 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0032] and figures 3-8A. * | by applicant | US2864488 | US4267921 | US2015284185 |