EP3523762 - ENVIRONMENT NAVIGATION USING REINFORCEMENT LEARNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deepmind Technologies Limited 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | For all designated states Deepmind Technologies Limited 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIOLA, Fabio 6 Pancras Square London Greater London N1C 4AG / GB | 02 /
MIROWSKI, Piotr Wojciech 6 Pancras Square London Greater London N1C 4AG / GB | 03 /
BANINO, Andrea 6 Pancras Square London Greater London N1C 4AG / GB | 04 /
PASCANU, Razvan 6 Pancras Square London Greater London N1C 4AG / GB | 05 /
SOYER, Hubert Josef 6 Pancras Square London Greater London N1C 4AG / GB | 06 /
BALLARD, Andrew James 6 Pancras Square London Greater London N1C 4AG / GB | 07 /
KUMARAN, Sudarshan 6 Pancras Square London Greater London N1C 4AG / GB | 08 /
HADSELL, Raia Thais 6 Pancras Square London Greater London N1C 4AG / GB | 09 /
SIFRE, Laurent 8 Rue de Londres 75009 Paris / FR | 10 /
GOROSHIN, Rostislav 6 Pancras Square London Greater London N1C 4AG / GB | 11 /
KAVUKCUOGLU, Koray 6 Pancras Square London Greater London N1C 4AG / GB | 12 /
DENIL, Misha Man Ray 6 Pancras Square London Greater London N1C 4AG / GB | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk GST 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | Martin, Philip John Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17812054.9 | 04.11.2017 | [2019/33] | WO2017IB56907 | Priority number, date | US201662418074P | 04.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662418074 P | [2019/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018083672 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3523762 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/092, G06N3/0442, G06N3/0464, G06N3/084, G06N3/006, G06N3/045 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
G06N3/084 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06N3/0464 (EP,CN);
G06F18/217 (US);
G06N3/006 (EP,KR,US);
G06N3/04 (US);
G06N3/044 (KR,US);
G06N3/0442 (EP,CN);
G06N3/045 (EP,KR,US);
G06N3/092 (EP,CN);
G06T7/50 (CN,US);
G06T7/70 (CN,US);
G06T2207/20076 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/37] | G06N3/0442, G06N3/0464, G06N3/084, G06N3/006, G06N3/045 | ||
Former IPC [2019/33] | G06N3/04, G06N3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] | Title | German: | UMWELTNAVIGATION UNTER VERWENDUNG VON VERSTÄRKUNGSLERNEN | [2019/33] | English: | ENVIRONMENT NAVIGATION USING REINFORCEMENT LEARNING | [2019/33] | French: | NAVIGATION D'ENVIRONNEMENT À L'AIDE D'UN APPRENTISSAGE PAR RENFORCEMENT | [2019/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 10.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I] - GUILLAUME LAMPLE ET AL, "Playing FPS Games with Deep Reinforcement Learning", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20160918), XP080727453 [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [02.2] - paragraph [03.2] * | [A] - CESAR CADENA ET AL, "Past, Present, and Future of Simultaneous Localization and Mapping: Toward the Robust-Perception Age", CORR (ARXIV), (20160720), vol. 1606.05830v2, pages 1 - 27, XP055448575 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [AD] - VOLODYMYR MNIH ET AL, "Asynchronous Methods for Deep Reinforcement Learning", CORR (ARXIV), (20160616), vol. 1602.01783v2, pages 1 - 19, XP055447272 [AD] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * | [A] - HO K L ET AL, "Loop closure detection in SLAM by combining visual and spatial appearance", ROBOTICS AND AUTONOMOUS SYSTEMS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 54, no. 9, ISSN 0921-8890, (20060930), pages 740 - 749, (20060930), XP027954528 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - TREVOR BARRON ET AL, "Deep Reinforcement Learning in a 3-D Blockworld Environment", WORKSHOP DEEP REINFORCEMENT LEARNING: FRONTIERS AND CHALLENGES, IJCAI 2016, (20160711), pages 1 - 6, XP055448052 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |