EP3421600 - LIVER-TYPE FATTY ACID-BINDING PROTEIN PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/01] | LIVER-TYPE FATTY ACID-BINDING PROTEIN PREPARATION, METHOD FOR EVALUATING PREPARATION, METHOD FOR REGULATING VARIATION RANGE OF MEASURED VALUE CAUSED BY LIVER-TYPE FATTY ACID-BINDING PROTEIN IN MEASUREMENT USING PREPARATION, LIVER-TYPE FATTY ACID-BINDING PROTEIN, DNA ENCODING PROTEIN, CELL TRANSFORMED BY DNA, METHOD FOR PRODUCING PROTEIN, METHOD FOR DRAWING CALIBRATION CURVE FOR LIVER-TYPE FATTY ACID-BINDING PROTEIN, AND METHOD FOR QUANTIFYING PROTEIN | ||
[2020/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CMIC Holdings Co. Ltd. 1-1-1 Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGAYA, Takeshi c/o CMIC Holdings Co., Ltd. 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | 02 /
OKAZAKI, Masateru c/o CMIC Holdings Co., Ltd. 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | 03 /
OIKAWA, Tsuyoshi c/o CMIC Holdings Co., Ltd. 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2019/01] | Application number, filing date | 17813408.6 | 15.06.2017 | [2019/01] | WO2017JP22209 | Priority number, date | JP20160120073 | 16.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016120073 | JP20160246001 | 19.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016246001 | [2019/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017217514 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3421600 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3421600 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C07K14/47, C12N1/15, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12P21/02, G01N33/68 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C12P21/02 (EP);
G01N33/68 (EP,US);
G01N2440/00 (EP);
G01N2496/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEBERFETTSÄUREBINDENDES PROTEINSPRÄPARAT UND VERFAHREN | [2020/26] | English: | LIVER-TYPE FATTY ACID-BINDING PROTEIN PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF | [2020/26] | French: | PRÉPARATION DE PROTÉINE DE LIAISON AUX ACIDES GRAS DU TYPE HÉPATIQUE ET SON UTILISATION | [2020/26] |
Former [2019/01] | PRÄPARAT AUS LEBERFETTSÄUREBINDENDEM PROTEIN, VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG DES PRÄPARATS, VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG DES VARIATIONSBEREICHS EINES GEMESSENEN WERTS EINES LEBERFETTSÄUREBINDENDEN PROTEINS BEI DER MESSUNG ANHAND DES PRÄPARATS, LEBERFETTSÄUREBINDENDES PROTEIN, DNA-CODIERENDES PROTEIN, DURCH DNA TRANSFORMIERTE ZELLE, VERFAHREN ZUR PROTEINHERSTELLUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR ZEICHNUNG DER KALIBRIERKURVE FÜR LEBERFETTSÄUREBINDENDES PROTEIN UND VERFAHREN ZUR PROTEINQUANTIFIZIERUNG | ||
Former [2019/01] | LIVER-TYPE FATTY ACID-BINDING PROTEIN PREPARATION, METHOD FOR EVALUATING PREPARATION, METHOD FOR REGULATING VARIATION RANGE OF MEASURED VALUE CAUSED BY LIVER-TYPE FATTY ACID-BINDING PROTEIN IN MEASUREMENT USING PREPARATION, LIVER-TYPE FATTY ACID-BINDING PROTEIN, DNA ENCODING PROTEIN, CELL TRANSFORMED BY DNA, METHOD FOR PRODUCING PROTEIN, METHOD FOR DRAWING CALIBRATION CURVE FOR LIVER-TYPE FATTY ACID-BINDING PROTEIN, AND METHOD FOR QUANTIFYING PROTEIN | ||
Former [2019/01] | PRÉPARATION DE PROTÉINE DE LIAISON AUX ACIDES GRAS DU TYPE HÉPATIQUE, PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION DE LA PRÉPARATION, PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE LA PLAGE DE VARIATION DE LA VALEUR MESURÉE PROVOQUÉE PAR LA PROTÉINE DE LIAISON AUX ACIDES GRAS DU TYPE HÉPATIQUE DANS LA MESURE À L'AIDE DE LA PRÉPARATION, PROTÉINE DE LIAISON AUX ACIDES GRAS DU TYPE HÉPATIQUE, ADN CODANT POUR LA PROTÉINE, CELLULE TRANSFORMÉE PAR L'ADN, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PROTÉINE, PROCÉDÉ POUR TRACER UNE COURBE D'ÉTALONNAGE D'UNE PROTÉINE DE LIAISON AUX ACIDES GRAS DU TYPE HÉPATIQUE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE QUANTIFICATION DE LA PROTÉINE | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2018 | Translation filed | 24.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 05.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.06.2017 | AL | 18.11.2020 | AT | 18.11.2020 | CY | 18.11.2020 | CZ | 18.11.2020 | DK | 18.11.2020 | EE | 18.11.2020 | ES | 18.11.2020 | FI | 18.11.2020 | HR | 18.11.2020 | LT | 18.11.2020 | LV | 18.11.2020 | MC | 18.11.2020 | PL | 18.11.2020 | RO | 18.11.2020 | RS | 18.11.2020 | SI | 18.11.2020 | SK | 18.11.2020 | SM | 18.11.2020 | BG | 18.02.2021 | NO | 18.02.2021 | GR | 19.02.2021 | IS | 18.03.2021 | PT | 18.03.2021 | IE | 15.06.2021 | LU | 15.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.06.2021 | ||
LU | 15.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.06.2021 | ||
LU | 15.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.06.2021 | ||
LU | 15.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.06.2021 | ||
LU | 15.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
LU | 15.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 18.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - THOMPSON JAMES ET AL, "The crystal structure of the liver fatty acid-binding protein. A complex with two bound oleates", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19970314), vol. 272, no. 11, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 7140 - 7150, XP002788455 [A] 7,8 * page 7143; figure 1 * * page 7146; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.11.7140 | [A] - "RENISHEM L-FABP ELISA TMB Kit A kit for quantitative determination of human LFABP in urine", (201508), pages 1 - 4, CMIC HOLDING Co., TOKYO, URL: https://www.fabp.jp/eng/pdf/161114_tmb_inst.pdf, (20190128), XP002788456 [A] 1-15 * page 3, column r, paragraph "quality control" * * page 4, column l, paragraph "3. repeatability" * | International search | [A]JPH08304395 (BETSUSERU RES LAB KK) [A] 1-15* , example 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2011007823 (UNIV TOKYO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , example 1 & US 2012/0135433 A1 example 1 *; | [A] - Ronald G.H.J. Maatman et al., "Expression of human liver fatty acid-binding protein in Escherichia coli and comparative analysis of its binding characteristics with muscle fatty acid-binding protein", Biochim. Biophys. Acta ., (19940000), vol. 1214, no. 1, pages 1 - 10, XP 023366541 [A] 1-15 * , particularly, summary, page 3, left column, 3rd paragraph to right column, 3rd paragraph, table 1 * | [A] - KIM YUN HO et al., "Comparing the effect on protein stability of methionine oxidation versus mutagenesis: Steps toward engineering oxidative resistance in proteins", Protein Engineering, (20010000), vol. 14, no. 5, pages 343 - 347, XP 002251172 [A] 1-15 * , particularly, 'Introduction', 2nd to 4th paragraphs * | [A] - Mark Cornell Manning et al., "Stability of Protein Pharmaceuticals: An Update", Pharmaceutical Res ., (20100000), vol. 27, no. 4, pages 544 - 575, XP 019793935 [A] 1-15 * , particularly, page 551, 'Methionine Sanka' * | [A] - Jing Yan, "Molecular mechanism of recombinant liver fatty acid binding protein's antioxidant activity", J. Lipid Res., (20090000), vol. 50, no. 12, pages 2445 - 2454, XP 055465183 [A] 1-15 * , particularly, summary, page 2446, left column, 2nd paragraph, pages 2450 to 2451, 'Sanka Methionine Zanki no Dotei', page 2452, right column, 3rd paragraph to page 2453, left column, 1st paragraph * | [A] - "Lenapro L-FABP test TMB", Data sheet, 3rd ed., (20150000), pages 1 - 4, URL: https://www.fabp.jp/pdf/MSDS_L-FABP.pdf, XP009508454 [A] 1-15 * , particularly, 'Keijo*Kozo To', 'Shiyo Mokuteki', 'Sokutei Genri', 'Yoho*Yoryo' * | Examination | US2012135433 |