EP3558028 - HEAT TREATMENT PLANT AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A HEAT TREATMENT PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPX Flow Technology Danmark A/S Pasteursvej 1 8600 Silkeborg / DK | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POULSEN, Ole Silkeborgvej 13 7442 Engesvang / DK | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Nordic Patent Service A/S Bredgade 30 1260 Copenhagen K / DK | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 17826223.4 | 20.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017EP83833 | Priority number, date | DK2016PA71047 | 23.12.2016 Original published format: DK PA201671047 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018115131 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3558028 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A23L3/18, F22B37/00, A23C3/037 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
A23L2/46 (EP);
A23C3/037 (EP,DK);
A23L3/16 (EP);
A23L3/18 (EP);
A23L3/22 (DK);
F22B27/00 (EP);
F22B37/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | WÄRMEBEHANDLUNGSANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER WÄRMEBEHANDLUNGSANLAGE | [2019/44] | English: | HEAT TREATMENT PLANT AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A HEAT TREATMENT PLANT | [2019/44] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 23.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2021 | Observations by third parties | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]GB789767 (LAGUILHARRE PIERRE R); | [Y]US5544571 (NAHRA JOHN E [US], et al); | [Y]WO2016087359 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]); | [E]WO2018038692 (METAN TEKNOLOJI MUHENDISLIK SANAYI VE TICARET LTD SIRKETI [TR]); | other | GB789767 | DE1043050 | US3973048 |