blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3485437

EP3485437 - DISTRIBUTED LEDGER PLATFORM FOR VEHICLE RECORDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.10.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.08.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.04.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 03.04.2024  [2024/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Royal Bank of Canada
1 Place Ville Marie 6th Floor North Wing
Montreal, QC H3C 3A9 / CA
[2024/14]
Former [2019/21]For all designated states
Royal Bank Of Canada
1 Place Ville Marie 6th Floor North Wing
Montreal, QC H3C 3A9 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / NAGLA, Gaurav
2872 Arlington Drive
Oakville Ontario L6L 6R4 / CA
02 / VINTILA, Iustina-miruna
Str. 9 Mai nr. 6 bloc 23A sc. B ap. 75 Sector 6
Bucharest / RO
 [2019/21]
Representative(s)Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Straße 11
80636 München / DE
[2024/14]
Former [2019/21]Patel, Binesh
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Application number, filing date17830146.118.07.2017
[2019/21]
WO2017CA50863
Priority number, dateUS201662363788P18.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662363788 P
US201662433293P13.12.2016         Original published format: US 201662433293 P
[2019/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018014123
Date:25.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3485437
Date:22.05.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3485437
Date:03.04.2024
Language:EN
[2024/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA25.01.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.2020
ClassificationIPC:G06F21/62, G06Q30/08, G06Q10/00, G06Q30/00, G06Q20/38, G06Q20/40, G06Q30/0601, H04L9/32, H04L9/00, H04L9/40, // G06Q30/014
[2023/42]
CPC:
G06Q30/0609 (EP,US); G06F21/6218 (EP,US); G06Q20/388 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4014 (EP,US); G06Q30/08 (EP,US); H04L63/08 (US);
H04L63/102 (EP,US); H04L63/123 (EP,US); H04L9/3236 (EP,US);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US); H04L9/50 (EP,US); G06Q2220/00 (EP,US);
G06Q30/014 (EP,US); G06Q40/03 (EP,US); H04L2209/84 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2020/11]G06Q30/08, G06Q10/00, G06Q30/00
Former IPC [2019/21]G06Q10/00, G06Q30/00, G06Q30/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PLATTFORM FÜR VERTEILTE LEDGER FÜR FAHRZEUGAUFZEICHNUNGEN[2019/21]
English:DISTRIBUTED LEDGER PLATFORM FOR VEHICLE RECORDS[2019/21]
French:PLATE-FORME DE GRAND LIVRE DISTRIBUÉE POUR ENREGISTREMENTS DE VÉHICULES[2019/21]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2019National basic fee paid 
21.01.2019Search fee paid 
21.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/21]
04.09.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.08.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.12.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2023Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.09.2023
08.09.2023Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
12.10.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2024Fee for grant paid
22.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
15.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
15.06.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]  - Melanie Swan, "E-COMMERCE", (20150122), URL: http://w2.blockchain-tec.net/blockchain/blockchain-by-melanie-swan.pdf, (20170913), XP055406241 [I] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [I]  - Andreas M. Antonopoulos, "Mastering Bitcoin - Unlocking Digital Cryptocurrencies", Mastering bitcoin : [unlocking digital cryptocurrencies], Beijing Cambridge Farnham Köln Sebastopol Tokyo, O'Reilly Media, (20141220), ISBN 978-1-4493-7404-4, XP055306939 [I] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [I]  - Thomas Hardjono ET AL, "DRAFT - Please Do Not Distribute Verifiable Anonymous Identities and Access Control in Permissioned Blockchains", (20160417), URL: http://connection.mit.edu/wp-content/uploads/sites/29/2014/12/ChainAnchor-Identities-04172016.pdf, XP055392888 [I] 1-16 * the whole document *
International search[A]US2015379510  (SMITH STANLEY BENJAMIN [US]) [A] 1-59;
 [XP]US2017048216  (CHOW ARTHUR CARROLL [CA], et al)[XP] 1-59
Examination   - Dr Gavin Wood, "ETHEREUM: A SECURE DECENTRALISED GENERALISED TRANSACTION LEDGER FINAL DRAFT -UNDER REVIEW", (20140604), URL: http://gavwood.com/paper.pdf, (20160118), XP055242189
    - Vitalik Buterin, "Merkling in Ethereum", Ethereum Blog, (20151115), URL: https://blog.ethereum.org/2015/11/15/merkling-in-ethereum/, (20170808), XP055397056
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.