EP3348587 - MODIFYING AGENT AND MODIFIED CONJUGATED DIENE-BASED POLYMER COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/29] | MODIFYING AGENT, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND MODIFIED CONJUGATED DIENE-BASED POLYMER COMPRISING SAME | ||
[2021/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUN, Min Sik LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KIM, No Ma LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
CHAI, Da Won LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Ho Young LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/29] | Application number, filing date | 17837928.5 | 05.09.2017 | [2018/29] | WO2017KR09721 | Priority number, date | KR20160155265 | 21.11.2016 Original published format: KR 20160155265 | KR20170094944 | 26.07.2017 Original published format: KR 20170094944 | [2018/29] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018093027 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3348587 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3348587 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/18, C08C19/44, C08C19/25, C08C19/22, C08C19/20, C08C19/12, C08F36/04, // C08F236/10, C08F236/06, C08F212/08, C08F4/48, C08F2/06, C08L15/00, C08L91/00, C08K3/36, C08K3/06, C08K3/22 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
C08C19/20 (EP,US);
C08F8/30 (KR);
C07F7/1804 (US);
C07F7/1892 (US);
C08C19/22 (EP,US);
C08C19/25 (EP,US);
C08C19/44 (EP,US);
C08F2/06 (EP,US);
C08F2/38 (KR);
C08F236/06 (EP,US);
C08F236/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08F236/14 (KR,US);
C08F36/14 (KR);
C08F8/42 (KR);
C08L15/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F236/06, C08F212/08 (US,EP);
C08F236/10, C08F2/06 (EP,US);
C08F236/10, C08F4/48 (US,EP);
C08L15/00, C08L91/00, C08L91/06, C08K3/36, C08K3/22, C08K5/09, C08K5/005, C08K5/0025, C08K3/06 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2019/08] | C07F7/18, C08C19/44, C08C19/25, C08C19/22, C08C19/20, C08C19/12, C08F36/04, // C08F236/10, C08F236/06, C08F212/08, C08F4/48, C08F2/06, C08L15/00, C08L91/00, C08K3/36, C08K3/06 | ||
Former IPC [2018/29] | C08F8/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERUNGSMITTEL UND MODIFIZIERTES KONJUGIERTES DIEN-BASIERTES POLYMER DAMIT | [2021/27] | English: | MODIFYING AGENT AND MODIFIED CONJUGATED DIENE-BASED POLYMER COMPRISING THE SAME | [2021/27] | French: | AGENT DE MODIFICATION ET POLYMÈRE À BASE DE DIÈNE CONJUGUÉ MODIFIÉ LE COMPRENANT | [2021/27] |
Former [2018/29] | MODIFIZIERUNGSMITTEL, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND MODIFIZIERTES KONJUGIERTES DIEN-BASIERTES POLYMER DAMIT | ||
Former [2018/29] | MODIFYING AGENT, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND MODIFIED CONJUGATED DIENE-BASED POLYMER COMPRISING SAME | ||
Former [2018/29] | AGENT DE MODIFICATION, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET POLYMÈRE À BASE DE DIÈNE CONJUGUÉ MODIFIÉ LE COMPRENANT | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2018 | Translation filed | 13.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 13.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2017 | AL | 17.11.2021 | AT | 17.11.2021 | CY | 17.11.2021 | CZ | 17.11.2021 | DK | 17.11.2021 | EE | 17.11.2021 | ES | 17.11.2021 | FI | 17.11.2021 | HR | 17.11.2021 | LT | 17.11.2021 | LV | 17.11.2021 | MC | 17.11.2021 | MK | 17.11.2021 | MT | 17.11.2021 | NL | 17.11.2021 | PL | 17.11.2021 | RO | 17.11.2021 | RS | 17.11.2021 | SE | 17.11.2021 | SI | 17.11.2021 | SK | 17.11.2021 | SM | 17.11.2021 | TR | 17.11.2021 | BG | 17.02.2022 | NO | 17.02.2022 | GR | 18.02.2022 | IS | 17.03.2022 | PT | 17.03.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 05.09.2017 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
MK | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
TR | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 05.09.2017 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
MK | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 05.09.2017 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 05.09.2017 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 17.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS6239563 ; | [A]US2016053059 (KIM JIN YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 10,12-14 * claims 1,2,7-10,13 * * examples 1-2; tables 1-3 * * paragraphs [0102] - [0104] *; | [A]EP3059257 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 10-14 * claims 1-3,8-13,15-16 * * examples 1-2; tables 1-5 * * comparative examples 1, 4 ** paragraphs [0006] , [0105] - [0107] *; | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 13, Database accession no. 1987-089883, XP002787826 & JPS6239563 A 19870220 (HOKKO CHEM IND CO LTD & UBE IND LTD) [X] 1,2,5 * table 1, compound 239 * * page 10, right-hand column , chemical equation (2) * * examples 2-4; claim 1 * [I] 3,4,6-9 | [A] - ROSENBERG ET AL, "Reactivity of 2-furylethylenes with nucleophylic groups and its biological signifiance", COLLECTION SYMPOSIUM SERIES (XIIITH SYMPOSIUM ON CHEMISTRY OF NUCLEIC ACID COMPONENTS SPINDLERUV MLYN, CZECH REPUBLIC; SEPTEMBER 03 -09, 2005); [COLLECTION SYMPOSIUM SERIES / INSTITUTE OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY AND BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE, (1987), vol. 52, no. 2, ISSN 0010-0765, ISBN 978-80-86241-25-8, pages 425 - 430, XP002162908 [A] 1,2,5-9 * abstract * * table 1, compounds VII-VIII * | International search | [XA]JPS6239563 (HOKKO CHEM. IND. CO., LTD.) [X] 5-9 * See claim l ; and page 10, chemical equation (2), examples 2-4. * [A] 1-4, 10-20; | [A]KR101586591B (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORPORATION) [A] 1-20 * See claims 1-4, 9: and chemical formulas (3)-(6), (8). *; | [A]JP2012167215 (UBE INDUSTRIES LTD.) [A] 1-20 * 06 September 2012 See claim 1. *; | [A]JPS63278946 (SUMITOMO CHEM. CO., LTD.) [A] 1-20 * See claim 1. *; | [A]JPS5293730 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD.) [A] 1-20 * See the claims; and page 2. * | by applicant | US4397994 |