EP3501492 - COSMETIC ANTI-BLEMISH COMPOSITION, USE OF THE COMPOSITION, ANTI-BLEMISH TREATMENT METHOD AND APPLICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Natura Cosméticos S.A. Avenida Alexandre Colares nº 1188 Bloco A - Vila Jaguará Brasil 05106-000 São Paulo - SP / BR | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TADINI D'ANNOLFO, Kassandra c/o Natura Cosméticos S.A. Avenida Alexandre Colares nº 1188 Bloco A - Vila Jaguará 05106-000 São Paulo - SP / BR | 02 /
CAROLLO MONCAYO, Priscila c/o Natura Cosméticos S.A. Avenida Alexandre Colares nº 1188 Bloco A - Vila Jaguará 05106-000 São Paulo - SP / BR | 03 /
DE OLIVEIRA REIS, Eduardo Alexandre c/o Natura Cosméticos S.A. Avenida Alexandre Colares nº 1188 Bloco A - Vila Jaguará 05106-000 São Paulo - SP / BR | 04 /
PAES, Fabiana c/o Natura Cosméticos S.A. Avenida Alexandre Colares nº 1188 Bloco A - Vila Jaguará 05106-000 São Paulo - SP / BR | 05 /
SANTOS DE OLIVEIRA, Ricardo Augusto c/o Natura Cosméticos S.A. Avenida Alexandre Colares nº 1188 Bloco A - Vila Jaguará 05106-000 São Paulo - SP / BR | 06 /
ZIMBARDI, Daniela c/o Natura Cosméticos S.A. Avenida Alexandre Colares nº 1188 Bloco A Vila Jaguará 05106-000 São Paulo - SP / BR | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Nicolle, Frederick Joseph Simmons & Simmons LLP CityPoint One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | Application number, filing date | 17840643.5 | 24.05.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017BR50126 | Priority number, date | BR20161019123 | 17.08.2016 Original published format: BR102016019123 | [2019/26] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018032073 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | PT | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3501492 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 22.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/9789, A61Q19/08, A61K8/31, A61K8/37, A61K8/891, A61K8/39, A61K8/58, A61K8/60, A61K8/892, A61K8/895, A61K8/73, A61Q19/00, A61K8/34, A61K8/44, A61K8/86, A61K8/04, A61K8/25, A61K8/67 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
A61Q19/08 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/97 (BR,US);
A61K8/042 (EP);
A61K8/19 (BR);
A61K8/25 (EP,BR);
A61K8/31 (EP);
A61K8/34 (BR);
A61K8/345 (BR);
A61K8/347 (EP,BR);
A61K8/37 (EP);
A61K8/39 (EP);
A61K8/4953 (US);
A61K8/585 (EP);
A61K8/604 (EP);
A61K8/64 (US);
A61K8/678 (EP,BR);
A61K8/735 (US);
A61K8/89 (BR);
|
Former IPC [2019/26] | A61K8/9789, A61Q19/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG GEGEN HAUTMAKEL, VERWENDUNG DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG GEGEN HAUTMAKEL UND ANWENDUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/26] | English: | COSMETIC ANTI-BLEMISH COMPOSITION, USE OF THE COMPOSITION, ANTI-BLEMISH TREATMENT METHOD AND APPLICATION DEVICE | [2019/26] | French: | COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE ANTI-RIDES, UTILISATION DE CETTE COMPOSITION, MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT ANTI-RIDES ET DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2018 | Translation filed | 17.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 17.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/17] | 20.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2007071704 (BRILLOUET ANNE S [FR], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,8,10,12,13 * pages 1-2, paragraphs 5,14-17 * * example - * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]US2009117061 (GROSS DENNIS F [US]) [X] 1-5,7-13 * page 1, paragraphs 4-16 * * page 3, paragraph 35 * * paragraphs [0058] - [0063] - [0069]; example - * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]US2012045405 (GILMAN MILES E [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 17 * * page 2, paragraphs 28-32 * * page 3, paragraphs 37-41,44 ** example . *; | [XY]US2012129956 (SUSAK MILANKA [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,10,12,13 * pages 1-2, paragraphs 5,6,8-30 * * example 1 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]US2014343169 (OMURA TAKAYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-4,8-10,12,13 * example - * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]GB2525895 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]) [X] 1,4,7-10,12,13 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 26 * * page 6, line 23 - page 8, line 17 * * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 16 * * example - * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]EP3043770 (IROS R C S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,10,12,13 * page 3, paragraphs 23-26 * * page 4, paragraphs 32-42 * * example 2 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY] - anonymous, "Regenerating Day Cream", GNPD, MINTEL, (20070410), Database accession no. 689122, URL: www.gnpd.com, XP055507865 [X] 1-5,7,8,10-13 * abstract * [Y] 1-15 | International search | [Y]EP0326491 (DIOT MICHEL [FR], et al) [Y] 1 a 22 * The whole document *; | [Y]JP2001322940 (KAO CORP) [Y] 1 a 22* The whole document *; | [XY]WO2015031971 (NATURA COSMÉTICOS S A [BR]) [X] 1 * The whole document * [Y] 2 a 22 |