EP3500248 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF FIBROUS DOSAGE FORMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/26] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF FIBROUS DOSAGE FORMS | ||
[2022/41] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blaesi, Aron H. Dieschen seura 1 7078 Lenzerheide / CH | [2019/49] |
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states Blaesi, Aron H. 4 Canal Park Apt. 403 Cambridge, Massachusetts 02141 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLAESI, Aron H. Dieschen seura 1 7078 Lenzerheide / CH | 02 /
SAKA, Nannaji 101 Western Avenue Apt. 51 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2024/06] |
Former [2019/26] | 01 /
SAKA, Nannaji 101 Western Avenue Apt. 51 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | ||
02 /
BLAESI, Aron, H. Dieschen seura 1 7078 Lenzerheide / CH | Application number, filing date | 17842255.6 | 19.08.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017US47703 | Priority number, date | US201662377068P | 19.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662377068 P | WO2016US58935 | 26.10.2016 Original published format: PCT/US2016/058935 | US201762446431P | 14.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762446431 P | US201762468888P | 08.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762468888 P | US201715482776 | 09.04.2017 Original published format: US201715482776 | WO2017US41609 | 11.07.2017 Original published format: PCT/US2017/041609 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018035511 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3500248 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, B29C64/106, B33Y80/00, B33Y70/00, B33Y40/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y10/00, A61K31/167, A61K31/192 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/70 (US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (US);
A61K47/34 (US);
A61K9/2031 (EP,US);
A61K9/2072 (EP,US);
B29C64/106 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/49] | A61K9/20, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y40/00, B33Y70/00, B33Y80/00, B29C64/106 | ||
Former IPC [2019/26] | A61K9/20, B29C67/00, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y40/00, B33Y50/00, B33Y50/02, B33Y70/00, B33Y80/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FASERIGEN DARREICHUNGSFORMEN | [2022/41] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF FIBROUS DOSAGE FORMS | [2022/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS DE FABRICATION DE FORMES POSOLOGIQUES FIBREUSES | [2022/41] |
Former [2019/26] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FASERIGEN DARREICHUNGSFORMEN | ||
Former [2019/26] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF FIBROUS DOSAGE FORMS | ||
Former [2019/26] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE FABRICATION DE FORMES POSOLOGIQUES FIBREUSES | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 24.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9841189 (THERICS INC [US]); | [X]US2008020049 (DARLING ANDREW [US], et al); | [XP]WO2017075096 (BLAESI ARON H [US]) | International search | [Y]US2004241302 (MATSUO SHUNICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2009098192 (FUISZ RICHARD C [US]); | [Y]US2010303883 (POLLOCK WAYNE C [US], et al); | [Y]DE102011011889 (LEISTRITZ EXTRUSIONSTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al); | [Y]WO2016038356 (UNIV CENTRAL LANCASHIRE [GB]); | [PX]WO2017075096 (BLAESI ARON H [US]) | by applicant | US2008020049 | WO2017075096 | WO2016US58935 | WO2017US41609 |