EP3506355 - DISTANCE SENSOR AND DISTANCE IMAGE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASE, Mitsuhito c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 02 /
HIRAMITSU, Jun c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 03 /
SHIMADA, Akihiro c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2023/24] |
Former [2019/27] | 01 /
MASE Mitsuhito c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | ||
02 /
HIRAMITSU Jun c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | |||
03 /
SHIMADA Akihiro c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 17845796.6 | 30.05.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017JP20055 | Priority number, date | JP20160166683 | 29.08.2016 Original published format: JP 2016166683 | [2019/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018042785 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3506355 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3506355 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N25/70, H01L27/144, H01L27/146 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
G01S7/481 (EP,KR,US);
G01S17/89 (EP,KR,US);
G01S7/4863 (US);
H01L27/144 (EP,KR);
H01L27/1443 (EP);
H01L27/146 (EP,KR);
H01L27/14603 (US);
H01L27/14612 (EP);
H01L27/1462 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/16] | H01L27/146, H01L27/144, G01S7/481, G01S17/89, H04N5/369, H04N5/374 | ||
Former IPC [2019/27] | H01L27/144, G01S7/481, G01S17/89, H01L27/146, H04N5/369, H04N5/374 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSTANDSSENSOR UND ABSTANDSBILDSENSOR | [2019/27] | English: | DISTANCE SENSOR AND DISTANCE IMAGE SENSOR | [2019/27] | French: | CAPTEUR DE DISTANCE ET CAPTEUR D'IMAGE DE DISTANCE | [2019/27] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2019 | Translation filed | 05.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 06.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2023 | CZ | 14.06.2023 | DK | 14.06.2023 | EE | 14.06.2023 | ES | 14.06.2023 | FI | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | IT | 14.06.2023 | LT | 14.06.2023 | LV | 14.06.2023 | NL | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SE | 14.06.2023 | SI | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | PT | 16.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 14.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007138590 (WELLS DAVID [US], et al); | [A]JP2011215073 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK); | [XI]JP2013033864 (SONY CORP); | [A]US2016225922 (AKKAYA ONUR CAN [US], et al) | International search | [Y]JPS4832946B ; | [Y]JP2011215073 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK); | [Y]JP2011222893 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK); | [Y]JP2013033864 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2015050223 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK); | [Y]JP2015520939 ; | [Y]JP2015185808 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |