blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3519632

EP3519632 - FLEXIBLY RESILIENT BARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.03.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.07.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2021Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.04.2021  [2021/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Marine Aluminium AS
P.O. Box 134
4299 Avaldsnes / NO
[2019/32]
Inventor(s)01 / RØD, Karl Johan
Smedasundet 56
5528 Haugesund / NO
 [2019/32]
Representative(s)Håmsø Patentbyrå AS
P.O. Box 171
4301 Sandnes / NO
[2019/32]
Application number, filing date17856877.027.09.2017
[2019/32]
WO2017NO50250
Priority number, dateNO2016000157530.09.2016         Original published format: NO 20161575
[2019/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018063004
Date:05.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3519632
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:XN05.04.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.2020
ClassificationIPC:E01F15/04
[2019/32]
CPC:
E01F15/0461 (EP); E01F15/0415 (EP,NO); E01F15/04 (KR);
E01F15/043 (EP); E01F15/14 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/32]
TitleGerman:FLEXIBEL ELASTISCHE BARRIERE[2019/32]
English:FLEXIBLY RESILIENT BARRIER[2019/32]
French:BARRIÈRE ÉLASTIQUE FLEXIBLE[2019/32]
Entry into regional phase26.03.2019National basic fee paid 
26.03.2019Search fee paid 
26.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/32]
10.11.2020Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2021/16]
01.12.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2021/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.202004   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2924168  (THREE S CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0045] - [0046]; figures 5-7 *;
 [A]EP2685002  (DEMO PROTEZIONI ANTIURTO S R L [IT]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0003] - [0004] - [ 0030]; figure 5 *
International search[A]DE3333037  (URLBERGER, Hermann Hans) [A] 1-9 * , see the whole document, particularly the abstract, the claims, and the figures. *;
 [A]US6315251  (STOUDT DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * , see the whole document, particularly the abstract, the claims 1, 8 and 9, and figure 5. *;
 [A]US3332666  (HARVEY GRAY JAMES) [A] 1-9 * , see the whole document, particularly the claims, and figures. *;
 [A]EP0677615  (TUBOSIDER ITALIANA S P A [IT]) [A] 1-9 * , see the whole document, particularly claim 1, and figures. *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.