EP3525543 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ACCESSING NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/33] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ACCESSING NETWORK | ||
[2021/44] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIA, Xiaoqian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LUO, Haiyan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | 01 /
JIA, Xiaoqian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
LUO, Haiyan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2019/33] | Application number, filing date | 17866806.7 | 24.10.2017 | [2019/33] | WO2017CN107487 | Priority number, date | CN201610954139 | 03.11.2016 Original published format: CN201610954139 | [2019/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018082476 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3525543 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/08, H04W74/08, H04B7/06, // H04W36/04 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04W16/28 (EP,CN,US);
H04W36/08 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/0617 (US);
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04B7/088 (EP,US);
H04W36/00 (EP,US);
H04W36/0058 (US);
H04W36/0072 (EP,CN,US);
H04W36/0077 (CN,US);
H04W36/14 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/02 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2019/33] | H04W74/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM ZUGRIFF AUF EIN NETZWERK | [2021/44] | English: | METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ACCESSING NETWORK | [2021/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS D'ACCÈS À UN RÉSEAU | [2021/44] |
Former [2019/33] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZUGRIFF AUF EIN NETZWERK | ||
Former [2019/33] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ACCESSING NETWORK | ||
Former [2019/33] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ACCÈS À UN RÉSEAU | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2019 | Translation filed | 07.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 20.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/36] | 22.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20090111434 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034] *; | [A]US2014376466 (JEONG CHEOL [KR], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0083] *; | [XI]EP2887561 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [X] 1,4,6,9 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0066] * [I] 2,3,5,7,8,10-14; | [XI]WO2016086144 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) [X] 1,4,6,9 * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0166] * * paragraph [0206] - paragraph [0248]; figure 23 * [I] 2,3,5,7,8,10-14; | US2019104549 [ ] (DENG TAO [US], et al); | [IP] - HUAWEI ET AL, "RACH resources for handover", vol. RAN WG2, no. Hangzhou, China; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170506), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1704842 RACH RESOURCES FOR HANDOVER, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_98/Docs/, (20170506), XP051264584 [IP] 1-14 * Section 2 * |