EP3550943 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING WIRING BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ULVAC, Inc. 2500 Hagisono Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa 253-8543 / JP | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO Muneyuki c/o ULVAC Inc. 2500 Hagisono Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa 253-8543 / JP | 02 /
MORIKAWA Yasuhiro c/o ULVAC Inc. 2500 Hagisono Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa 253-8543 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI Minoru c/o ULVAC Inc. 2500 Hagisono Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa 253-8543 / JP | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Zacco GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 17875378.6 | 30.11.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017JP43062 | Priority number, date | JP20160235054 | 02.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016235054 | [2019/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018101404 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3550943 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/26, H05K3/00, H05K3/46 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
H05K3/4673 (EP);
H05K3/26 (EP,KR);
H05K3/0041 (EP,US);
H05K3/467 (US);
H05K2201/0376 (EP);
H05K2203/095 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINER LEITERPLATTE | [2019/41] | English: | METHOD FOR PROCESSING WIRING BOARD | [2019/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UN TABLEAU DE CONNEXIONS | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2018 | Translation filed | 21.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 26.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 16.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6150074 (SHIMOTO TADANORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * figures 2,4 * * column 7, lines 5-11,50-59 * * column 8, lines 1-24,33-37 *; | [Y]US2009229872 (TAKAIKE EIJI [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * figures 7,8,23,24 * * paragraphs [0076] , [0106] - [0108] - [0160] - [0163] *; | [Y]JP2010001543 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO) [Y] 1-5* paragraphs [0007] , [0 12] * | International search | [YA]JP2009224616 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO) [Y] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0120]-[0131], fig. 20-27 & US 2009/0229872 A1, paragraphs [0156]-[0167], fig. 20-27 * [A] 6; | [YA]JP2010001543 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO) [Y] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0007], [0012] (Family: none) *[A] 6 |