EP3553595 - REVERSE MODE LIQUID CRYSTAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JNC Corporation 2-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8105 / JP | For all designated states JNC Petrochemical Corporation 2-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANABE Mayumi c/o JNC PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION ICHIHARA RESEARCH CENTER 5-1 Goikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-8551 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMURA Yoshinari c/o JNC PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION ICHIHARA RESEARCH CENTER 5-1 Goikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-8551 / JP | 03 /
FUJITA Hiroaki c/o JNC PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION ICHIHARA RESEARCH CENTER 5-1 Goikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-8551 / JP | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/42] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17878431.0 | 08.12.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017JP44174 | Priority number, date | JP20160238852 | 08.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016238852 | [2019/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018105726 | Date: | 14.06.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3553595 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13, C09K19/56, C09K19/04, C09K19/12, C09K19/30, C09K19/34, C09K19/54 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
C09K19/56 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/1334 (US);
C09K19/04 (US);
G02F1/13 (EP,KR);
G02F1/133723 (US);
G02F1/137 (US);
B32B2457/20 (US);
B32B2457/202 (US);
C09K2019/0448 (EP,US);
C09K2019/122 (EP);
C09K2019/123 (EP);
C09K2019/3009 (EP);
C09K2019/301 (EP);
C09K2019/3016 (EP);
C09K2019/3027 (EP);
C09K2019/3037 (EP);
C09K2019/3078 (EP);
C09K2019/3422 (EP);
C09K2019/546 (EP);
C09K2219/13 (EP);
C09K2323/00 (US);
C09K2323/02 (US);
G02F1/13347 (US);
G02F1/133742 (US);
G02F1/13712 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/42] | G02F1/13, C09K19/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Title | German: | REVERSE-MODUS-FLÜSSIGKRISTALLVORRICHTUNG | [2019/42] | English: | REVERSE MODE LIQUID CRYSTAL DEVICE | [2019/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES EN MODE INVERSE | [2019/42] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2019 | Translation filed | 26.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 05.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]JP3890841B (ASAHI GLASS CO., LTD.) [Y] 5-7 * , paragraphs [0009]-[0040], fig. 1 (Family: none) *[A] 1-4, 8-28; | [PY]CN106753428 (SHENZHEN CHINA STAR OPTOELECT) [P] 5-7 * , claims 1-10, paragraphs [0006]-[0083], fig. 3, 4 (Family: none) * [Y] 10, 11, 18 | by applicant | JPS6450689 | JPH02503443 | JPH0686408 | JP2000008040 | JP2003255315 | JP4036076B | JP4063873B | JP2008266550 | JP2008266632 | JP5162985B | JP5295471B | WO2014013150 | JP2015023330 | WO2015022980 | JP2015181370 | WO2015199148 | WO2016015803 | WO2016051938 | JP2016120581 | WO2016129490 | JP6081361B | WO2017130566 | - Liquid Crystals, vol. 43, no. 2, pages 162 - 167 | - Macromolecules, (19900000), vol. 23, pages 2474 - 2477 | - Molecular Crystals and Liquid Crystals, (19910000), vol. 195, pages 221 - 37 | - Molecular Crystals and Liquid Crystals, (19860000), vol. 137, no. 1-4, pages 349 - 64 |