EP3563484 - DIGITAL PHASE LOCKED LOOP FREQUENCY ESTIMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANIN, Elan Brener 54A 43606 Raanana M / IL | 02 /
AMEL, Roy MTM Haifa 31015 Haifa Ha / IL | 03 /
SHIMON, Ran Tel Hai 7 5233529 Ramat Gan M / IL | 04 /
RAVI, Ashoke 1413 SW Hume Ct. Portland Oregon 97219 / US | 05 /
DINUR, Nati Mor 12/8 34407 Haifa Ha / IL | [2019/50] |
Former [2019/45] | 01 /
BANIN, Elan Brener 54A 43606 Raanana M / IL | ||
02 /
AMEL, Roy MTM Haifa 31015 Haifa Ha / IL | |||
03 /
SHIMON, Ran Tel Hai 7 5233529 Ramat Gan M / IL | |||
04 /
RAVI, Ashoke 1422 NE Carlaby Way Hillsboro, Oregon 97124 / US | |||
05 /
DINUR, Nati Mor 12/8 34407 Haifa Ha / IL | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/45] | Lambsdorff & Lange Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Grillparzerstraße 12A 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17885640.7 | 12.10.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017US56351 | Priority number, date | US201615395504 | 30.12.2016 Original published format: US201615395504 | [2019/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018125364 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3563484 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/099, H03L7/06, H03L7/08, H03L7/085, H03L7/089, H03L7/093, H03L7/10 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
H03L7/10 (EP);
H03L7/08 (US);
H03L7/085 (US);
H03L9/00 (US);
H04L27/0014 (EP,US);
H03L2207/50 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/45] | H03L7/099, H03L7/06, H03L7/08, H03L7/085, H03L7/089, H03L7/093 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Title | German: | SCHÄTZUNG VON DIGITALER PHASENREGELSCHLEIFENFREQUENZ | [2019/45] | English: | DIGITAL PHASE LOCKED LOOP FREQUENCY ESTIMATION | [2019/45] | French: | ESTIMATION DE FRÉQUENCE DE BOUCLE À VERROUILLAGE DE PHASE NUMÉRIQUE | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 26.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015145567 (PERROTT MICHAEL H [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0063]; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP1237338 (CENTRAL RESEARCH LAB LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0034]; figures 9-11 *; | [Y]US8259874 (QI RONGGANG [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 19, line 49 - column 22, line 65; figures 15-19 * | International search | [A]US2007035345 (SIDDALL WILLIAM M [NZ]) [A] 21, 22 * entire document *; | [A]EP2999121 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2002159539 (ALCOCK ROBERT DAVID [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2014210532 (JENKINS JULIAN [AU]) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2010310031 (BALLANTYNE GARY JOHN [NZ], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2011050998 (GAO LI [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2016322980 (XU YANG [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2008304609 (LOSIC NOVICA A [CA]) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2015145570 (PERROTT MICHAEL H [US]) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2013214834 (WEN GAN [CN]) [A] 1-22 * entire document * | by applicant | US2015145567 | EP1237338 | US8259874 |