EP3565196 - FLOW CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/45] | FLOW CONTROL METHOD, DEVICE, CU, DU AND STORAGE MEDIUM | ||
[2024/01] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Yin ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
HE, Qingchun ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, He ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/45] | Application number, filing date | 17887712.2 | 09.11.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017CN110291 | Priority number, date | CN201611245343 | 29.12.2016 Original published format: CN201611245343 | [2019/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018121096 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3565196 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3565196 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L47/30, H04L47/10, H04L47/26, H04W28/02, H04W28/10, H04W88/08, H04W92/12 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
H04L47/30 (EP,CN);
H04W28/0231 (EP,CN);
H04W28/10 (EP,CN,US);
H04L47/10 (EP,CN);
H04L47/26 (EP,CN);
H04W76/12 (CN,US);
H04W76/27 (CN,US);
H04W80/02 (CN,US);
H04W80/08 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/51] | H04L12/801, H04L12/835, H04L12/825, H04W28/02, H04W28/10, H04W88/08, H04W92/12 | ||
Former IPC [2019/45] | H04L12/801, H04L12/835 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUSSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2024/01] | English: | FLOW CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2024/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉGULATION DE FLUX | [2024/01] |
Former [2019/45] | FLUSSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG, CU, DU UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | ||
Former [2019/45] | FLOW CONTROL METHOD, DEVICE, CU, DU AND STORAGE MEDIUM | ||
Former [2019/45] | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF DE RÉGULATION DE FLUX, CU, DU ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2019 | Translation filed | 23.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 10.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013167647 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1-8 * * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 28 * * page 12, line 8 - page 13, line 12 * * page 16, line 20 - page 19, line 35 * * page 21, line 14 - page 23, line 19 *; | [X]US2015103666 (TERRY STEPHEN E [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 15] , [0016] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0037] *; | [A] - CATTCHINA TELECOM, "Considerations on RAN function split between CU and DU", vol. RAN WG3, no. Reno, Nevada, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161114), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-162863_CONSIDERATION ON FUNCTION SPLIT BETWEEN CU AND DU, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN3/Docs/, (20161114), XP051178962 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |