EP3571527 - A RADIATION DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Xpectvision Technology Co., Ltd. B507, Block A and B Nanshan Medical Device Industrial Park Nanhai Avenue 1019 Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2022/14] |
Former [2020/21] | For all designated states Shenzhen Xpectvision Technology Co., Ltd. Suite 201, Building B52 Tanglang Industrial Area No. 13 at No. Five Xinyi Road Tanglang Community, Taoyuan Str., Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518071 / CN | ||
Former [2020/07] | For all designated states Shenzhen Xpectvision Technology Co., Ltd. Suite 201, Building B52 Tanglang Industrial Area No. 13 at No. Five Xinyl Road Tanglang Community, Taoyuan Str., Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518071 / CN | ||
Former [2019/48] | For all designated states Shenzhen Xpectvision Technology Co., Ltd. Room 201 Block A No. 1 Qianwan Road 1 Shenzhen-Hong Kong Cooperative District Shenzhen 518054 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Peiyan Shenzen Xpectvision Technology Co., Ltd. Room 201 Block A No. 1 Qianwan Road 1 Shenzhen-Hong Kong Cooperative District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518054 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Yurun Shenzen Xpectvision Technology Co., Ltd. Room 201 Block A No. 1 Qianwan Road 1 Shenzhen-Hong Kong Cooperative District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518054 / CN | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2019/48] | Application number, filing date | 17892910.5 | 23.01.2017 | [2019/48] | WO2017CN72175 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018133088 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3571527 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/16, G01T1/24, G01N23/083, A61B6/00 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
G01T1/247 (EP,US);
G01T1/241 (US);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/4208 (EP,US);
A61B6/4233 (US);
G01N23/046 (US);
G01T1/2928 (US);
G01V5/222 (EP,US);
A61B6/502 (EP,US);
A61B6/51 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Title | German: | STRAHLUNGSDETEKTOR | [2019/48] | English: | A RADIATION DETECTOR | [2019/48] | French: | DÉTECTEUR DE RAYONNEMENT | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 08.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US8053722 (ASGHARI MEHDI [US], et al); | [Y]US2016045176 (KIMURA SHUNSUKE [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2016161544 (SHENZHEN XPECTVISION TECH CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [A]CN102135626 (SIEMENS AG); | [Y]US8053722 (ASGHARI MEHDI [US], et al); | [A]CN103430533 (SCHERRER INST PAUL); | [A]WO2014175458 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2016161544 (SHENZHEN XPECTVISION TECH CO LTD [CN]) | by applicant | WO2016161544 |