EP3468719 - FLUIDIC DEVICES AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illumina, Inc. 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EARNEY, John, Gerhardt 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 02 /
FULLERTON, Justin 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Kaleb 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 04 /
VENKATESAN, Bala, Murali, K. c/o Illumina, Inc. IP Legal Department 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2019/30] |
Former [2019/26] | 01 /
EARNEY, John, Gerhardt 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | ||
02 /
FULLERTON, Justin 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
03 /
SMITH, Kaleb 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
04 /
VENKATESAN, Bala, Murali, K. c/o Illumina, Inc. - IP Legal Department 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 94122 / US | |||
Former [2019/21] | 01 /
EARNEY, John, Gerhardt 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | ||
02 /
FULLERTON, Justin 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
03 /
SMITH, Kaleb 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
04 /
VENKATESAN, Bala, Murali, K. c/o Illumina, Inc. - IP Legal Department 5200 Illumina Way San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | |||
Former [2019/16] | 01 /
EARNEY, John, Gerhardt 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | ||
02 /
FULLERTON, Justin 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
03 /
SMITH, Kaleb 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
04 /
VENKATESAN, Bala, Murali, K. 499 Illinois Street Suite 210 San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/16] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17895252.9 | 12.12.2017 | [2019/16] | WO2017US65855 | Priority number, date | US201762452923P | 31.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762452923 P | [2019/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018144138 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3468719 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, G01N15/14, F16J15/10, F16J15/14, B29C65/16, B81C1/00 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
B01L3/502707 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01J19/0093 (IL,US);
B01L3/00 (IL,RU);
B01L3/502715 (IL,KR);
B01L3/50273 (IL,US);
B01L3/502738 (EP,IL,US);
B29C65/1635 (EP,IL,US);
B29C65/1654 (EP,IL,US);
B29C65/168 (EP,IL,US);
B29C65/1683 (EP,IL,US);
B29C65/4815 (EP,IL,US);
B29C65/5057 (EP,IL,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,IL,US);
B29C66/53461 (EP,IL,US);
B33Y50/02 (IL,US);
B81C1/00 (IL,RU);
B81C1/00269 (IL,US);
B81C3/001 (EP,IL,US);
F16J15/108 (EP,IL,US);
F16J15/14 (EP,IL,US);
G01N15/1484 (IL,KR);
G01N27/44791 (IL,US);
G02B26/005 (EP,IL,US);
G02B3/14 (EP,IL,US);
B01L2200/0684 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01L2200/0689 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01L2200/12 (EP,IL,US);
B01L2300/041 (IL,KR);
B01L2300/0645 (EP,IL,US);
B01L2300/0861 (IL,KR);
B01L2300/0887 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01L2300/12 (IL,KR);
B01L2300/123 (EP,IL,US);
B01L2300/1827 (EP,IL,US);
B01L2400/0439 (EP,IL,US);
B01L2400/0487 (EP,IL,US);
B01L2400/0655 (EP,IL,US);
B29C2035/0838 (EP,IL,US);
B29L2031/756 (EP,IL,US);
B81B2201/047 (EP,IL,US);
B81B2201/054 (EP,IL);
B81B2201/058 (EP,IL,US);
B81C2203/037 (EP,IL)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/16] | B01L3/00, G01N15/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Title | German: | FLUIDISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/16] | English: | FLUIDIC DEVICES AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2019/16] | French: | DISPOSITIFS FLUIDIQUES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2019/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 30.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002176804 (STRAND DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003137630 (NIIYA HIROTAKA [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011157679 (FIKE III EUGENE E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2012087369 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2012140873 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,10 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018] - [0027] , [0033] , [0034] * * figures 1, 6 * [I] 2-9,11-15; | [A]US2016023208 (FISHER JEFFREY S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016268541 (DABICH II LEONARD CHARLES [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2003137630 (NIIYA HIROTAKA [JP]) [Y] 12, 13, 15-22 * See paragraph [0027]; claim 1; and figure 1. *; | [YA]US2011157679 (FIKE III EUGENE E [US], et al) [Y] 12, 13, 15-22 * See abstract; paragraphs [0005], [0021], [0024], [0058], [0084], [0160], [0182]; and claims 1, 32. * [A] 1-11, 14; | [A]US2012051523 (FEKE GILBERT [US]) [A] 1-22* See paragraph [0018]; and claim 1. *; | [A]WO2012087369 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0044], [0080], [0081]; claims 1-4, 12-14, 19; and figures 5A-5C. *; | [A]US2014335301 (VAN T OEVER RONNY [NL], et al) [A] 1-22 * See paragraph [0023]; claims 21, 36, 39; and figures 2, 3A-3E. * |