EP3586714 - MEDICAL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Olympus Medical Solutions Inc. 4-7-1 Koyasu-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0904 / JP | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMANO, Kohtaro c/o SONY OLYMPUS MEDICAL SOLUTIONS INC. 4-7-1 Koyasu-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0904 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Yuichi c/o SONY OLYMPUS MEDICAL SOLUTIONS INC. 4-7-1 Koyasu-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0904 / JP | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/01] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 17900201.9 | 25.10.2017 | [2020/01] | WO2017JP38576 | Priority number, date | JP20170044213 | 08.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017044213 | [2020/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018163498 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3586714 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3586714 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, G02B23/24, A61B1/05, G02B6/42, G02B6/38 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
G02B6/3877 (EP,US);
A61B1/00 (EP);
A61B1/00009 (US);
A61B1/00013 (EP);
A61B1/00018 (EP);
A61B1/0011 (US);
A61B1/00114 (EP,US);
A61B1/00117 (EP,US);
A61B1/00124 (EP);
A61B1/00126 (EP,US);
A61B1/00165 (US);
A61B1/051 (EP);
G02B23/24 (EP);
H04N7/183 (US);
H04N7/22 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | A61B1/00, G02B23/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2020/01] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING MEDICAL DEVICE | [2020/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL | [2020/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2019 | Translation filed | 15.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 16.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8942530 (DEMERS JOSEPH R [US], et al) [A] 1-10* column 13, line 46 - column 14, line 48; figure 13 *; | [X]WO2016170838 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0022] , [0024] , [0028] - [0032]; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]US2016316995 (MICHIHATA TAIHEI [JP]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * paragraphs [0023] - [0027] - [0041] - [0052]; figures 1,2 * [I] 8; | [XI]US2017049301 (HAGIHARA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * paragraphs [0034] - [0058]; figures 1-4 * [I] 8 | International search | [A]JP2004202040 (SYSTEMS KK I, et al) [A] 1-10 * , [0 *; | [Y]US2013012777 (BAUM ECKHART [DE], et al) [Y] 2-5, 7-9 * , [0069 *; | [A]JP2013033158 (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 1-10 * , [ *; | [Y]WO2014171332 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [Y] 2-5, 7-9 * , [0 *; | [XY]WO2016002415 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [X] 1, 6, 10 * , [0 * [Y] 2-5, 7-9; | [A]WO2016147556 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10* , [0 ( * | by applicant | WO2012033200 |