EP3617536 - BIAXIAL HINGE MECHANISM USED ON MOBILE TERMINAL AND MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, FI, LT | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Amphenol Phoenix Telecom Parts Co., Ltd. No.98-5 (South), Road 19 Hangzhou Economic and Technological Development Zone Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Yuanyue No.98-5 (South), Road 19 Hangzhou Economic and Technological Development Zone Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | 02 /
FEI, Jingci No.98-5 (South), Road 19 Hangzhou Economic and Technological Development Zone Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | 03 /
SI, Mengyu No.98-5 (South), Road 19 Hangzhou Economic and Technological Development Zone Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 17907938.9 | 26.09.2017 | [2020/10] | WO2017CN103322 | Priority number, date | CN201720458186U | 27.04.2017 Original published format: CN 201720458186 U | [2020/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018196275 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3617536 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3617536 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16C11/04, G06F1/16 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
G06F1/1681 (EP,US);
E05D5/125 (US);
E05D5/14 (US);
F16C11/04 (EP,US);
G06F1/16 (EP);
G06F1/1616 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/10] | F16C11/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIAXIALER SCHARNIERMECHANISMUS ZUR VERWENDUNG AUF EINEM MOBILEN ENDGERÄT UND MOBILES ENDGERÄT | [2020/10] | English: | BIAXIAL HINGE MECHANISM USED ON MOBILE TERMINAL AND MOBILE TERMINAL | [2020/10] | French: | MÉCANISME DE CHARNIÈRE BIAXIALE DESTINÉ À UN TERMINAL MOBILE ET TERMINAL MOBILE | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2019 | Translation filed | 10.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 09.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN202971543U (KUNSHAN WANHE PRECISE INDUSTRY CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]CN203796732U (AMPHENOL PHOENIX TELECOM PARTS) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [I]CN203948431U (LIANHONG TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015101148 (LEE CHUNG-YU [TW], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0018] *; | [XI]US2015362958 (SHANG QILONG [CN]) [X] 1,3-6,9,10 * the whole document * [I] 2,7,8 |