EP3644641 - USER EQUIPMENT AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARADA, Hiroki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT Docomo Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT Docomo Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
WANG, Jing c/o DOCOMO Beijing Communications Laboratories Co. Ltd. 7/F Raycom Infotech Park Tower A No.2 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 17914265.8 | 21.06.2017 | [2020/18] | WO2017JP22913 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018235208 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3644641 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16, H04W56/00, H04W36/00 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
H04W24/08 (EP,US);
H04B17/309 (US);
H04W36/0088 (EP);
H04W48/16 (EP);
H04W56/00 (EP);
H04B17/318 (EP);
H04W48/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/18] | H04W24/10, H04W56/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Title | German: | BENUTZERGERÄT UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2020/18] | English: | USER EQUIPMENT AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2020/18] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2020 | Translation filed | 07.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 10.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - NOKIA ET AL, "DL Signals for Mobility Measurements in NR and Mobility schemes", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1703097, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170212), XP051210235 [X] 1-3,6 * 1. Introduction; 2.2.1 IDLE/INACTIVE Mode; 3. Simulation Results on NR-SSSS RSRP Accuracy; 3.2 Link level evaluation in CDL-E 10ns channel below 40 GHz (@30GHz) * [I] 4,5 | [XI] - INTEL CORPORATION, "SS Block based RRM measurements", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, P.R. China; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170617), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1710514 INTEL SS BLOCK RSRP, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1706/Docs/, (20170617), XP051305085 [X] 1-3,6 * the whole document * [I] 4,5 | [A] - NOKIA ET AL, "SS Block Measurements and Procedures", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170616), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1711268, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1706/Docs/, (20170616), XP051304437 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Discussion on NR RRM measurement based on CSI-RS for L3 mobility", vol. RAN WG1, no. Hangzhou; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1708445_DISCUSSION ON NR RRM MEASUREMENT BASED ON CSI-RS FOR L3 MOBILITY_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 S, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170514), XP051273637 [A] 1-6 * 2. Discussion on CSI-RS configuration * | International search | [XY] - MEDIATEK, "WF On RRM measurement", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#89 Rl-1709810, (20170519), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_89/Docs/R1-1709810.zip, (20170801), XP051285563 [X] 1-4, 6 * , entire text * [Y] 5 | [Y] - INTEL CORPORATION, "S S block composition", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#89 Rl-1707337, (20170507), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WGl_RL1/TSGR1_89/Docs/Rl-1707337.zip, (20170801), XP051262997 [Y] 5 * , entire text * | [Y] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Discussion on SS block composition and SS burst set composition", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#89 Rl-1707588, (20170506), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_89/Docs/Rl-1707588.zip, (20170801), XP051261930 [Y] 5 * , entire text * |