EP3705104 - ANKLE BRACE OR ANKLE EXOSKELETON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Obshchestvo S Ogranichennoy Otvetstvennost'yu "Exoatlet" 1-j Truzhenikov per. 15 Ofis 1 Moscow 119121 / RU | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PISMENNAYA, Elena Valentinovna Michurinskiy pr-t 54 korp. 3 kv. 71 Moscow 119192 / RU | 02 /
TOLSTOV, Kirill Mihailovich Yaroslavskoe shosse 121 kv. 25 Moscow 129347 / RU | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Jeck, Anton Jeck, Fleck & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [2023/23] |
Former [2020/37] | Jeck, Anton Jeck, Fleck & partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 17930482.9 | 08.11.2017 | [2020/37] | WO2017RU00839 | Priority number, date | RU20170137860 | 31.10.2017 Original published format: RU 2017137860 | [2020/37] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019088869 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | RU | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3705104 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3705104 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 09.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61H3/00, A61F5/01, A61H1/02 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
A61F5/0127 (EP,US);
A61F5/0113 (US);
A61H1/0266 (EP);
A61H3/00 (EP,RU,US);
A61F2005/0158 (EP,US);
A61F2005/0167 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0041 (US);
A61F2220/0091 (US);
A61H2003/007 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0192 (EP);
A61H2201/123 (EP);
A61H2201/1238 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/37] | A61H3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRUNGGELENKORTHESE ODER SPRUNGGELENK-EXOSKELETT | [2020/37] | English: | ANKLE BRACE OR ANKLE EXOSKELETON | [2020/37] | French: | ARTICULATION TIBIO-TARSIENNE D'UNE ORTHÈSE OU D'UN EXOSQUELETTE | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2020 | Translation filed | 02.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 25.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 18.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 18.04.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 18.04.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 24.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 24.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | NL | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2567195 (ELLERY EMMETT C) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US3805773 (SICHAU H) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [A]FR3004105 (UNIV SABANCI [TR]) [A] 1-14 * page 5, line 3 - line 20; figure 1 *; | [A]US2015342820 (SHIMADA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020]; figure 2 * | International search | [A]JP2012099790 (CANON KK) [A] 1-14; | [A]FR3004105 (UNIV SABANCI [TR]) [A] 1-14 * , fig. 1, p. 5, lines 12-20 *; | [A]US2015342820 (SHIMADA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14; | [A]WO2016067229 (SPECIALITIES S R L [IT]) [A] 1-14; | [A]US9492302 (WIGGIN MICHAEL B [US], et al) [A] 1-14; | [A]US9662262 (HOLLANDER KEVIN [US], et al)[A] 1-14 | by applicant | RU2362598 | WO2013049658 | RU2563209 |