EP3706349 - HYBRID AUTOMATIC REPEAT REQUEST FEEDBACK INDICATION AND FEEDBACK METHOD, DEVICE, AND BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2020/37] | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Yajun No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/37] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 17931883.7 | 17.11.2017 | [2020/37] | WO2017CN111709 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019095304 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3706349 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
H04L1/1896 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (CN);
H04L1/1819 (US);
H04L1/1607 (CN);
H04L1/1812 (EP,CN);
H04L1/1854 (EP);
H04L5/00 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (CN);
H04W72/04 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (CN,US);
H04W72/23 (CN,US);
H04W76/27 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Title | German: | ANZEIGE DER RÜCKKOPFFLUNG HYBRIDER AUTOMATISCHER WIEDERHOLUNGSANFRAGEN UND RÜCKKOPPLUNGSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND BASISSTATION | [2020/37] | English: | HYBRID AUTOMATIC REPEAT REQUEST FEEDBACK INDICATION AND FEEDBACK METHOD, DEVICE, AND BASE STATION | [2020/37] | French: | INDICATION DE RÉTROACTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉTROACTION DE DEMANDE DE RÉPÉTITION AUTOMATIQUE HYBRIDE, DISPOSITIF ET STATION DE BASE | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2020 | Translation filed | 03.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 27.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2017184049 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [X] 1-14 * figures 1, 3a, 8 * * page 8, line 26 - page 12, line 24 * * page 15, line 24 - page 17, line 19 * * tables A, B, D *; | [X] - HUAWEI ET AL, "HARQ timing, multiplexing, and bundling", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nagoya, Japan; 20170918 - 20170921, (20170917), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1715408, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170917), XP051338876 [X] 1-14 * pages 1-3 * | [X] - HUAWEI HISILICON, "Discussion on timing relations and signaling of HARQ timing for NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161113), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1611218, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161113), XP051175199 [X] 1,2,7,8,13,14 * page 2 * |