EP3537413 - RELIABLE LOW-POWER MEMORY-BASED PUF ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karlsruher Institut für Technologie Kaiserstrasse 12 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Golanbari, Mohammed Saber Weiherstr. 18 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
Kiamehr, Saman Lobensteiner Str. 12 71229 Leonberg / DE | 03 /
Bishnoi, Rajendra Berliner Ring 2 76676 Graben-Neudorf / DE | 04 /
Tahoori, Mehdi Grünberger Straße 11 76139 Karlsruhe / DE | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 18000240.4 | 09.03.2018 | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3537413 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G09C1/00 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
G09C1/00 (EP);
H04L2209/12 (EP);
H04L9/0866 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUVERLÄSSIGE SPEICHERBASIERTE PUF-ARCHITEKTUR MIT NIEDRIGEM STROMVERBRAUCH | [2019/37] | English: | RELIABLE LOW-POWER MEMORY-BASED PUF ARCHITECTURE | [2019/37] | French: | ARCHITECTURE PUF BASÉE SUR UNE MÉMOIRE DE FAIBLE PUISSANCE FIABLE | [2019/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 01.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2016065379 (HOLCOMB DANIEL E [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * figures 1a,1b,1c * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0033] *; | [I]FR2970591 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [I] 1-14 * figures 1,2 * * page 2, line 21 - page 11, line 5 *; | [A]CN204291000U (UNIV TIANJIN) [A] 1-14 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | - J.P. KULKARNI et al., "A 160 mV, fully differential, robust Schmitt trigger based sub-threshold SRAM", ILSPED, (20070000), doi:doi:10.1145/1283780.1283818, pages 171 - 176, XP058379967 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1283780.1283818 |