EP3492878 - METHOD FOR DETERMINATION OF THE TRANSIT TIME OF AN ULTRASONIC SIGNAL IN A FLOWING MEDIUM AND ULTRASONIC FLOW METER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, MK | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diehl Metering GmbH Industriestrasse 13 91522 Ansbach / DE | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wetzel, Marcus Falkenstr. 8b DE - 91560 Heilsbronn / DE | 02 /
Gaugler, Ulrich Am Sandbuck 13 DE - 91746 Weidenbach / DE | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstraße 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [2020/31] |
Former [2019/23] | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18000915.1 | 20.11.2018 | [2019/23] | Priority number, date | DE20171011145 | 01.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017011145 | DE20171011861 | 21.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017011861 | [2019/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3492878 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3492878 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/66 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
G01F1/667 (EP,US);
G01F1/66 (US);
G01N29/024 (US);
G01N29/222 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] |
Former [2019/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER LAUFZEIT EINES ULTRASCHALLSIGNALS IN EINEM STRÖMENDEN MEDIUM SOWIE ULTRASCHALLDURCHFLUSSMESSER | [2019/23] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINATION OF THE TRANSIT TIME OF AN ULTRASONIC SIGNAL IN A FLOWING MEDIUM AND ULTRASONIC FLOW METER | [2019/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DU TEMPS DE TRANSIT D'UN SIGNAL ULTRASONORE DANS UN MILIEU FLUIDE AINSI QUE DÉBITMÈTRE ULTRASONORE | [2019/23] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 05.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2018 | AL | 29.07.2020 | CY | 29.07.2020 | CZ | 29.07.2020 | EE | 29.07.2020 | ES | 29.07.2020 | FI | 29.07.2020 | HR | 29.07.2020 | LT | 29.07.2020 | LV | 29.07.2020 | MC | 29.07.2020 | MK | 29.07.2020 | MT | 29.07.2020 | NL | 29.07.2020 | RO | 29.07.2020 | RS | 29.07.2020 | SI | 29.07.2020 | SK | 29.07.2020 | SM | 29.07.2020 | BG | 29.10.2020 | NO | 29.10.2020 | GR | 30.10.2020 | IE | 20.11.2020 | LU | 20.11.2020 | IS | 29.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | PT | 30.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 20.11.2018 | |
AL | 29.07.2020 | ||
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
MT | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IE | 20.11.2020 | ||
LU | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IE | 20.11.2020 | ||
LU | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 29.07.2020 | |
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | ES | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | ES | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | ES | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19841154 (LOEHMER HOLGER [DE], et al) [X] 1,14 * page 2, line 61 - line 65 *; | [YA]US6062091 (BAUMOEL JOSEPH [US]) [Y] 4,11 * page 32, line 35 - line 38; figures 7,9 * * page 8, line 49 - line 50 *[A] 5,6,10; | [X]US6435038 (NAM SANG-YONG [KR]) [X] 1,14 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 18 *; | [XYI]DE102009046562 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,7-9,13,14 * paragraphs [0011] , [0024] , [0035] , [0036]; claim 1 * [Y] 4,11 [I] 3,5,6,10,12; | [A]US2011282596 (PATEL SHWETAK N [US], et al) [A] 3 * paragraph [0099] *; | [X]WO2016184709 (ENDRESS & HAUSER FLOWTEC AG [CH]) [X] 1,14 * page 10, line 13 - line 24 * |