EP3345480 - USE OF A CHESTNUT TANNIN EXTRACT AS ACARICIDAL AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sadepan Chimica S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 29 46019 Viadana / IT | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSTA, Gianluca Via Tazio Magni, 16 I-26040 Gussola (CR) / IT | 02 /
GOZZI, Dario Via Baghella, 3B I-46019 Viadana (MN) / IT | 03 /
FERRANTE, Mattia Via La Spezia, 77 I-43125 Parma (PR) / IT | 04 /
ZAMBELLI, Pierluigi Via Garibaldi, 13 I-26041 Casalmaggiore (CR) / IT | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al BIRD & BIRD SOCIETA TRA AVVOCATI S.R.L. Via Porlezza, 12 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/28] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Studio Legale Bird & Bird Via Borgogna, 8 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 18150286.5 | 04.01.2018 | [2018/28] | Priority number, date | IT20170001121 | 05.01.2017 Original published format: IT201700001121 | [2018/28] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3345480 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3345480 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/00, A01N31/16, A01N65/08, A01P7/02 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
A01N65/08 (EP,US);
A01N25/00 (EP,US);
A01N31/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/28] | A01N25/00, A01N31/16, A01N65/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] |
Former [2018/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES EXTRAKTES VON KASTANIE ALS AKARIZIDES MITTEL | [2019/50] | English: | USE OF A CHESTNUT TANNIN EXTRACT AS ACARICIDAL AGENT | [2018/28] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN EXTRAIT DE CHATAIGNE COMME AGENT ACARICIDE | [2018/28] |
Former [2018/28] | VERWENDUNG EINES EXTRAKTES VON KASTANIE AS AKARIZIDES MITTEL | Examination procedure | 11.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 11.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.01.2018 | AL | 01.04.2020 | AT | 01.04.2020 | CY | 01.04.2020 | CZ | 01.04.2020 | EE | 01.04.2020 | FI | 01.04.2020 | HR | 01.04.2020 | LT | 01.04.2020 | LV | 01.04.2020 | MC | 01.04.2020 | PL | 01.04.2020 | RO | 01.04.2020 | RS | 01.04.2020 | SE | 01.04.2020 | SI | 01.04.2020 | SK | 01.04.2020 | SM | 01.04.2020 | BG | 01.07.2020 | NO | 01.07.2020 | GR | 02.07.2020 | IS | 01.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | IE | 04.01.2021 | LU | 04.01.2021 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 04.01.2021 | ||
LU | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 04.01.2021 | ||
LU | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 01.04.2020 | |
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | BG | 01.07.2020 | |
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | BG | 01.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000247820 ; | [Y]JPH09194493 ; | [Y]JP2010180131 ; | [Y]JP2008072961 ; | [A]CA868958 (LALEMAN CHARLES) [A] 1-15 * example 1 *; | [A]WO9953763 (SUBBA RAO PILLARISETTI VENKATA [IN], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1, 2, 7 *; | [AD]ITRE20000089 (NUOVA RIVART S P A [IT]) [AD] 1-15 * claims 1, 2 *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 03, Database accession no. 2001-019034, XP002770804 & JP2000247820 A 20000912 (MOTOMURA M) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 40, Database accession no. 1997-431464, XP002770805 & JPH09194493 A 19970729 (AJINOMOTO TAKARA CORP) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - MERLE JULIETTE ET AL, "New biobased foams from wood byproducts", MATERIALS & DESIGN, (20151122), vol. 91, doi:10.1016/J.MATDES.2015.11.076, ISSN 0264-1275, pages 186 - 192, XP029361433 [A] 1-15 * page 191, column 1, line 1 - line 10 * * samples M2, M4, M11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matdes.2015.11.076 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 58, Database accession no. 2010-K58676, XP002770806 & JP2010180131 A 20100819 (DAINIPPON JOCHUGIKU KK) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2008, no. 39, Database accession no. 2008-G14005, XP002770807 & JP2008072961 A 20080403 (UNIV KAGOSHIMA) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - BARGIACCHI ET AL, "Biostimulant activity of hydrolyzable tannins from sweet chestnut (Castanea sativa mill.)", ISHS ACTA HORTICULTURAE,, (20130101), pages 111 - 116, XP009188151 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 113, line 22 - line 34 * * table 2 * | [Y] - L. MAISTRELLO ET AL, "Effect of chestnut tannins on the root-knot nematode Meloidogyne javanica", HELMINTHOLOGIA, SL, (20100101), vol. 47, no. 1, doi:10.2478/s11687-010-0008-9, ISSN 0440-6605, pages 48 - 57, XP055244638 [Y] 1-15 * page 54, column 2, line 4 - line 8 * * page 55, column 1, line 4 - line 8 * * tables 1, 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2478/s11687-010-0008-9 | [Y] - FERNANDEZ-SALAS A ET AL, "In vitro acaricidal effect of tannin-rich plants against the cattle tick Rhipicephalus (Boophilus) microplus (Acari: Ixodidae)", VETERINARY PARASITOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 175, no. 1-2, ISSN 0304-4017, (20110110), pages 113 - 118, (20100922), XP027525912 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 114, column 1, line 38 - line 44 * * paragraphs 3.1, 3.2 * * figure 1 * * table 1 * | [T] - FADI HASSANAT ET AL, "Assessment of the effect of condensed (acacia and quebracho) and hydrolysable (chestnut and valonea) tannins on rumen fermentation and methane production in vitro : Impact of condensed and hydrolysable tannins on methane production in vitro", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, GB, (20120627), vol. 93, no. 2, doi:10.1002/jsfa.5763, ISSN 0022-5142, pages 332 - 339, XP055378864 [T] * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jsfa.5763 | [A] - PERNAS MONICA ET AL, "A chestnut seed cystatin differentially effective against cysteine proteinases from closely related pests", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, SPRINGER, DORDRECHT, NL, (19981201), vol. 38, no. 6, doi:10.1023/A:1006154829118, ISSN 0167-4412, pages 1235 - 1242, XP002304727 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1236, column 1, line 12 - line 36 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1006154829118 |