EP3345540 - CATHETER WITH SUPPORTING STRUCTURE HAVING VARIABLE CROSS-SECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam 2066717 / IL | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Steven 15715 Arrow Highway Irwindale, CA California 91706 / US | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2018/28] | Application number, filing date | 18150636.1 | 08.01.2018 | [2018/28] | Priority number, date | US201715401166 | 09.01.2017 Original published format: US201715401166 | [2018/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3345540 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3345540 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/367, A61B18/14, A61B34/20, A61M25/00 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,IL,US);
A61B5/283 (CN);
A61B5/287 (EP,US);
A61B18/1477 (IL,US);
A61B5/367 (CN);
A61B5/6858 (EP,IL,US);
A61B5/6859 (EP,IL,US);
A61M25/001 (EP,IL,US);
A61M25/0023 (CN);
A61M25/0043 (CN);
A61M25/0054 (IL);
A61M25/0067 (IL);
A61B2018/0016 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00214 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00267 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00351 (IL,US);
A61B2018/00357 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2018/00839 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1405 (IL,US);
A61B2018/1467 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/28] | A61B5/00, A61B18/14, A61B5/042, A61B34/20, A61M25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] |
Former [2018/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KATHETER MIT STÜTZSTRUKTUR MIT VARIABLEN QUERSCHNITTEN | [2018/28] | English: | CATHETER WITH SUPPORTING STRUCTURE HAVING VARIABLE CROSS-SECTIONS | [2018/28] | French: | CATHÉTER À STRUCTURE DE SUPPORT AVEC SECTIONS TRANSVERSALES VARIABLES | [2018/28] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 11.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 08.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21214689.8 / EP4000506 | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.05.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 08.05.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.05.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.01.2022 | AT | 26.01.2022 | CZ | 26.01.2022 | DK | 26.01.2022 | EE | 26.01.2022 | ES | 26.01.2022 | FI | 26.01.2022 | HR | 26.01.2022 | LT | 26.01.2022 | LV | 26.01.2022 | PL | 26.01.2022 | RO | 26.01.2022 | RS | 26.01.2022 | SE | 26.01.2022 | SI | 26.01.2022 | SK | 26.01.2022 | SM | 26.01.2022 | BG | 26.04.2022 | NO | 26.04.2022 | GR | 27.04.2022 | IS | 26.05.2022 | PT | 26.05.2022 | [2023/10] |
Former [2023/01] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 26.01.2022 | |
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 26.01.2022 | |
NO | 26.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6071274 (THOMPSON RUSSELL B [US], et al) [I] 1,6-15 * column 8, line 22 - column 11, line 16; figure 2a * * column 17, line 33 - column 19, line 39; figures 32,33 * * column 29, line 4 - column 29, line 42; figure 56 *; | [A]WO0108600 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 11-15* page 5, line 20 - line 28 *; | [XI]EP3040042 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER ISRAEL LTD [IL]) [X] 1-5,11 * paragraphs [0012], [0013], [0017], [0018], [0019], [0029], [0031];; figures 1,4A,5,8-12 * [I] 12 | by applicant | US5391199 | WO9605768 | US5772590 | US6064905 | US6239724 | US6332089 | US2002065455 | US6484118 | US2003120150 | US6618612 | US6690963 | US2004068178 | US6748255 | US6973340 |