Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3348819

EP3348819 - METHOD TO CONTROL AN ELECTRICALLY-OPERATED TURBOCHARGER IN A SUPERCHARGED INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.04.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.11.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FERRARI S.p.A.
Via Emilia Est, 1163
41100 Modena / IT
[2018/29]
Inventor(s)01 / FAVARETTO, Fabrizio
Via Dante Alighieri, 7D
41043 FORMIGINE / IT
 [2018/29]
Representative(s)Maccagnan, Matteo , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2018/29]
Application number, filing date18152188.117.01.2018
[2018/29]
Priority number, dateIT2017000455717.01.2017         Original published format: IT201700004557
[2018/29]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3348819
Date:18.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:F02D41/00, F02B37/10, F02B37/12, F02B39/10, F02B41/10
[2018/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES ELEKTRISCH BETRIEBENEN TURBOLADERS IN EINEM TURBOGELADENEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR[2018/29]
English:METHOD TO CONTROL AN ELECTRICALLY-OPERATED TURBOCHARGER IN A SUPERCHARGED INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE[2018/29]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN TURBOCOMPRESSEUR ACTIONNÉ ÉLECTRIQUEMENT DANS UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE SURALIMENTÉ[2018/29]
Examination procedure14.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.11.2018Examination requested  [2018/52]
15.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.01.2019Observations by third parties
29.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2019Observations by third parties
02.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Documents cited:Search[I]DE102015119016  (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS LLC (N D GES D STAATES DELAWARE) [US]) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0016] * * paragraphs [0027] , [0031] , [0033] * * paragraphs [0040] , [0042] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0046] * * paragraphs [0054] , [0055] * * paragraphs [0069] - [0074] * * paragraphs [0077] - [0079] * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP2096277  (MAGNETI MARELLI POWERTRAIN SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0015] - [0026]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE4131438  (MERCEDES BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, lines 34-50 * * column 2, lines 1-15 *;
 [A]WO2016000016  (KERBS AUTOTECH PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0027] * * paragraph [0035] *;
 [A]FR3014947  (RENAULT SA [FR]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, lines 4-31 * * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 6 * * page 6, line 34 - page 7, line 13 * * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 7 *
by applicantUS2006218923
 EP2096277
 US2016138508