blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3363423

EP3363423 - DENTAL COMPOSITE BLOCK FOR PREPARING PERMANENT INDIRECT RESTORATIONS IN CAD/CAM METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.07.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.08.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.06.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.09.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VOCO GmbH
Anton-Flettner-Strasse 1-3
27472 Cuxhaven / DE
[2018/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Oldenburger, Daniel
Sahlenburger Weg 23
27476 Cuxhaven / DE
02 / Maletz, Reinhard
Schillerstrasse 69
27472 Cuxhaven / DE
03 / Fontein, Nils
Harmonie 7
27472 Cuxhaven / DE
04 / Plaumann, Manfred Thomas
Schillerstrasse 79
27472 Cuxhaven / DE
 [2018/34]
Application number, filing date18153169.024.01.2018
[2018/34]
Priority number, dateDE20171010308415.02.2017         Original published format: DE102017103084
[2018/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3363423
Date:22.08.2018
Language:DE
[2018/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3363423
Date:23.09.2020
Language:DE
[2020/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2018
ClassificationIPC:A61K6/30
[2020/25]
CPC:
A61K6/30 (EP,US); A61C13/0004 (US); A61C13/0022 (US);
A61C13/082 (US); A61C19/02 (US); A61C3/005 (US);
A61K6/71 (EP,US); A61K6/887 (EP,US); C08K3/36 (US);
C08K3/40 (US); C08K9/06 (US); C08K2201/005 (US);
C08K2201/011 (US) (-)
C-Set:
A61K6/887, C08L33/06 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2018/34]A61K6/00, A61K6/083
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/42]
Former [2018/34]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:DENTALER KOMPOSITBLOCK ZUR HERSTELLUNG PERMANENTER INDIREKTER RESTAURATIONEN IM CAD/CAM VERFAHREN[2018/34]
English:DENTAL COMPOSITE BLOCK FOR PREPARING PERMANENT INDIRECT RESTORATIONS IN CAD/CAM METHOD[2018/34]
French:BLOC COMPOSITE DENTAIRE DESTINÉ À LA FABRICATION DE RESTAURATIONS INDIRECTES PERMANENTES DANS LE PROCÉDÉ CAD/CAM[2018/34]
Examination procedure24.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.09.2018Examination requested  [2018/42]
24.01.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2020Fee for grant paid
14.08.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.08.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP20189996.0  / EP3760181
Opposition(s)24.06.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.202003   M06   Fee paid on   10.03.2020
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.01.2018
AL23.09.2020
CY23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
DK23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
FI23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
IT23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
MK23.09.2020
NL23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
IE24.01.2021
LU24.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
BE31.01.2021
[2024/23]
Former [2023/33]HU24.01.2018
AL23.09.2020
CY23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
DK23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
FI23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
IT23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
NL23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
IE24.01.2021
LU24.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
BE31.01.2021
Former [2023/30]AL23.09.2020
CY23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
DK23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
FI23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
IT23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
NL23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
IE24.01.2021
LU24.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
BE31.01.2021
Former [2023/29]AL23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
DK23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
FI23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
IT23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
NL23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
IE24.01.2021
LU24.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
BE31.01.2021
Former [2022/34]AL23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
DK23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
FI23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
IT23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
IE24.01.2021
LU24.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
BE31.01.2021
Former [2022/07]AL23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
DK23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
FI23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
IT23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
IE24.01.2021
LU24.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/48]AL23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
DK23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
FI23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
IT23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
LU24.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/43]AL23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
DK23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
FI23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
LU24.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/40]AL23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
DK23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
FI23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/37]AL23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
DK23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
FI23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/36]AL23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
FI23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/28]AL23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
FI23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/25]AL23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
FI23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/22]CZ23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
FI23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/21]FI23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/20]FI23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
Former [2021/10]FI23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
Former [2021/08]FI23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
NO23.12.2020
Former [2021/07]FI23.09.2020
NO23.12.2020
Documents cited:Search[X]US2014200284  (ECKERT ADRIAN S [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,11,12 * paragraphs [0049] , [0 86] , [ 116] , [ 119] , [ 122] , [ 128]; claims 1, 8, 10; table 2 *;
 [A]US2014220512  (ABUELYAMAN AHMED S [US], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0008] , [0 86] , [0111] , [ 145]; claim 1 *
Examination   - SARA VANOORBEEK ET AL, "Computer-aided designed computer-assisted manufactured composite resin versus ceramic single-tooth restorations: A 3-year clinical study", THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNA OF PROSTHODONTICS, (2010), vol. 23, no. 3, pages 223 - 230
    - ULF SCHEPKE ET AL, "Clinical bonding of resin nano ceramic restorations to zirconia abutments: A case series within a randomized clinical trial", CLIN IMPLANT DENTREALT RS., (2016), vol. 18, no. 5, doi:10.1111/cid.12382, pages 984 - 992
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.