EP3536354 - SYNTHETIC BONE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SYNTHETIC BONE USING RAPID PROTOTYPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität Zürich Rämistrasse 71 8006 Zürich / CH | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARSHAD, Mazda Im Ring 6 8126 Zumikon / CH | 02 /
BURKHARD, Marco Rain 1 8833 Samstagern / CH | 03 /
FÜRNSTAHL, Philipp Mettlenweg 16 8193 Eglisau / CH | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Schulz Junghans Patentanwälte PartGmbB Großbeerenstraße 71 10963 Berlin / DE | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 18159979.6 | 05.03.2018 | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3536354 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/50, A61L27/56, G09B23/28, G09B23/30, G09B23/34 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
A61L27/50 (EP);
A61L27/56 (EP);
G09B23/28 (EP);
G09B23/285 (EP);
G09B23/30 (EP);
G09B23/306 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNTHETISCHER KNOCHEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SYNTHETISCHEN KNOCHENS MITTELS SCHNELLEM PROTOTYPING | [2019/37] | English: | SYNTHETIC BONE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SYNTHETIC BONE USING RAPID PROTOTYPING | [2019/37] | French: | OS SYNTHÉTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN OS SYNTHÉTIQUE PAR PROTOTYPAGE RAPIDE | [2019/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/35] | 01.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017263158 (EAST JOHNNY WAYNE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2014193776 (THURNER MARC [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [[0016]] , [ [0041]]; claim - *; | [A]US6993406 (CESARANO III JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * columns 1, 5, 7; claim - *; | [XI] - SHENGFA WANG, "Lightweight of Artificial Bone Models Utilizing Porous Structures and 3D Printing", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PERFORMABILITY ENGINEERING, (20170101), doi:10.23940/ijpe.17.05.p8.633642, XP055503478 [X] 1-7,10,11,13,14 * page 633 - page 634; figure 7 * [I] 8,9,12,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.23940/ijpe.17.05.p8.633642 | [X] - DONG J YOO, "Porous scaffold design using the distance field and triply periodic minimal surfacemodels", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, vol. 32, no. 31, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2011.07.019, ISSN 0142-9612, (20110707), pages 7741 - 7754, (20110714), XP028268192 [X] 1-4,8,10-14 * page 7742 - page 7743; figure 16 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2011.07.019 | [X] - AFSHAR M ET AL, "Additive manufacturing and mechanical characterization of graded porosity scaffolds designed based on triply periodic minimal surface architectures", JOURNAL OF THE MECHANICAL BEHAVIOR OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160528), vol. 62, doi:10.1016/J.JMBBM.2016.05.027, ISSN 1751-6161, pages 481 - 494, XP029641488 [X] 1-4,10,11,13,14 * pages 482, 493; figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmbbm.2016.05.027 | [A] - YÁNEZ A ET AL, "Gyroid porous titanium structures: A versatile solution to be used as scaffolds in bone defect reconstruction", MATERIALS & DESIGN, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20171123), vol. 140, doi:10.1016/J.MATDES.2017.11.050, ISSN 0264-1275, pages 21 - 29, XP085414273 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matdes.2017.11.050 | by applicant | WO2016115625 |