EP3392580 - HOUSEHOLD REFRIGERATOR HAVING A THERMAL CONDUCTIVITY ELEMENT ARRANGED AT A FRONT FLANGE OF THE INNER LINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwarz, Jörg Paumannstraße 130 90469 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Glaser, Benjamin Riedhauser Str. 29a 89415 Lauingen (Donau) / DE | 03 /
Schlander, Ulrich Hirtenbergweg 13 89278 Nersingen / DE | [2018/43] | Application number, filing date | 18162897.5 | 20.03.2018 | [2018/43] | Priority number, date | DE201710206088 | 10.04.2017 Original published format: DE102017206088 | [2018/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3392580 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3392580 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F25D21/04 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
F25D21/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] |
Former [2018/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSKÄLTEGERÄT MIT EINEM AN EINEM FRONTFLANSCH DES INNENBEHÄLTERS ANGEORDNETEN WÄRMELEITELEMENT | [2018/43] | English: | HOUSEHOLD REFRIGERATOR HAVING A THERMAL CONDUCTIVITY ELEMENT ARRANGED AT A FRONT FLANGE OF THE INNER LINER | [2018/43] | French: | APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER FRIGORIFIQUE DOTÉ D'UN CONDUCTEUR DE CHALEUR DISPOSÉ SUR UNE BRIDE AVANT DU RÉCIPIENT INTERNE | [2018/43] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 24.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.03.2018 | AL | 10.06.2020 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | DK | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | ES | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | HR | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | NL | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | RS | 10.06.2020 | SE | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | SM | 10.06.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | NO | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | |
NO | 10.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS5663978U (NOT KNOWN) [X] 1,5,6,8,9,13,14 * figures 1-2 * [I] 7; | [A]JPS59152372U (NOT KNOWN) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]JPH0664087U (NOT KNOWN) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2002062023 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XYI]JP2002243348 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-5,8,9,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0018] * [Y] 10-12 [I] 7; | [I]JP2003065652 (HITACHI LTD) [I] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2004156840 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [YA]DE202014005490U (BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERÄTE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 10-12 * abstract * [A] 1; | [XI]DE102014225196 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] , [0 29] , [0 39] , [0 40] * [I] 7 | by applicant | DE202014005490U |