EP3358234 - LOCKOUT DEVICES FOR USE WITH ROTARY ACTUATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher Controls International LLC 205 South Center St. Marshalltown, IA 50158 / US | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELL, Brandon Wayne 1805 West Olive St. Marshalltown, Iowa 50158 / US | 02 /
MAHCKE, Lynn Dean 2218 Gary Court Marshalltown, Iowa 50158 / US | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2023/51] |
Former [2018/32] | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18163641.6 | 03.02.2012 | [2018/32] | Priority number, date | US201113042926 | 08.03.2011 Original published format: US201113042926 | [2018/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3358234 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3358234 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16K35/06, F16K35/10 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
F16K35/06 (EP,US);
F16K35/10 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20582 (US);
Y10T74/20666 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] |
Former [2018/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BLOCKIERVORRICHTUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT DREHAKTUATOREN | [2018/32] | English: | LOCKOUT DEVICES FOR USE WITH ROTARY ACTUATORS | [2018/32] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE VERROUILLAGE À UTILISER AVEC DES ACTIONNEURS ROTATIFS | [2018/32] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 07.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2021 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 04.01.2022 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 22.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12709726.9 / EP2683972 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2023 | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | IT | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | NL | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 20.12.2023 | |
CZ | 20.12.2023 | ||
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4062208 (NIELSEN JR ANKER J) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-14; | [A]US2002078721 (VELLETTE MICHEL [CA], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2005092367 (ESPINOZA ROGER [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-4 * |