EP3546952 - METHOD FOR UNSEALING AN OPENING OF A LABORATORY SAMPLE CONTAINER, METHOD FOR HANDLING A LABORATORY SAMPLE CONTAINER, LABORATORY APPARATUS AND LABORATORY AUTOMATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstraße 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mueller, Daniel c/o Roche Diagnostics International AG Forrenstrasse 2 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/40] | Application number, filing date | 18164036.8 | 26.03.2018 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3546952 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3546952 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/04 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
G01N35/04 (EP,CN,US);
B65B69/0066 (CN);
G01N35/10 (US);
B01D35/02 (US);
B01F25/00 (US);
B01L3/00 (US);
B01L3/02 (US);
B04B11/04 (US);
B04B5/04 (US);
B23P19/00 (US);
B65B7/16 (US);
B65B7/28 (US);
G01N1/28 (US);
G01N2035/00346 (US);
G01N2035/0405 (EP,US);
G01N21/77 (US);
G01N33/543 (US);
G01N35/00 (US);
G01N35/02 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] |
Former [2019/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTSIEGELUNG EINER ÖFFNUNG EINES LABORPROBENBEHÄLTERS, VERFAHREN ZUR HANDHABUNG EINES LABORPROBENBEHÄLTERS, LABORVORRICHTUNG UND LABORAUTOMATIONSSYSTEM | [2019/40] | English: | METHOD FOR UNSEALING AN OPENING OF A LABORATORY SAMPLE CONTAINER, METHOD FOR HANDLING A LABORATORY SAMPLE CONTAINER, LABORATORY APPARATUS AND LABORATORY AUTOMATION SYSTEM | [2019/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DESCELLEMENT D'UNE OUVERTURE D'UN RÉCIPIENT D'ÉCHANTILLONS DE LABORATOIRE, PROCÉDÉ DE MANIPULATION D'UN RÉCIPIENT D'ÉCHANTILLONS DE LABORATOIRE, APPAREIL DE LABORATOIRE ET SYSTÈME D'AUTOMATISATION DE LABORATOIRE | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 01.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
SE | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2941464B ; | [Y]US2002041828 (SPITZ URS [CH], et al); | [A]US2007134131 (WATSON LESLIE R [AU], et al); | [A]EP1944345 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2010027283 (ZYGEM CORP LTD [NZ], et al) | Examination | JP2013108797 | JP2017026381 | by applicant | EP2995958 |