EP3381863 - EXTENDABLE MAST SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR A MATERIAL HANDLING VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Raymond Corporation 20 South Canal Street Greene, New York 13778-0130 / US | [2018/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOWE, David B 702 Brotzman Rd. Binghamton, NY New York 13901 / US | [2018/40] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18165372.6 | 03.04.2018 | [2018/40] | Priority number, date | US201762478989P | 30.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762478989 P | [2018/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3381863 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3381863 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/08 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
B66F9/08 (EP,US);
B66F11/04 (CN);
B66F13/00 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] |
Former [2018/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSFAHRBARE MASTSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN MATERIALHANDHABUNGSFAHRZEUG | [2018/40] | English: | EXTENDABLE MAST SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR A MATERIAL HANDLING VEHICLE | [2018/40] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ACCOUDOIR RÉGLABLE POUR VÉHICULE DE MANUTENTION DE MATÉRIAUX | [2018/40] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 29.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2018 | AL | 26.05.2021 | AT | 26.05.2021 | CY | 26.05.2021 | CZ | 26.05.2021 | DK | 26.05.2021 | EE | 26.05.2021 | ES | 26.05.2021 | FI | 26.05.2021 | HR | 26.05.2021 | LT | 26.05.2021 | LV | 26.05.2021 | MC | 26.05.2021 | MK | 26.05.2021 | MT | 26.05.2021 | NL | 26.05.2021 | PL | 26.05.2021 | RO | 26.05.2021 | RS | 26.05.2021 | SI | 26.05.2021 | SK | 26.05.2021 | SM | 26.05.2021 | BG | 26.08.2021 | NO | 26.08.2021 | GR | 27.08.2021 | IS | 26.09.2021 | PT | 27.09.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 03.04.2018 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
MK | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 03.04.2018 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 03.04.2018 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2936047 (QUAYLE GEORGE F) [A] 1-15 * column 3 - column 7, line 17; figures 7, 8 *; | [A]US3083853 (HASTINGS JR RUSSELL) [A] 1,10,15* figure 5 *; | [A]DE2049952 (ALLMANNA SVENSKA ELEKTRISKA AB) [A] 1,10,15 * figures 1-8 *; | [A]US3871494 (KELLY JR WILFRED H) [A] 1,10,15 * abstract * |