EP3392470 - METHOD OF ASSEMBLING TURBINE, ASSEMBLY WORK SUPPORTING SYSTEM, AND CONTROL PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Hitachi Power Systems, Ltd. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASHIRODAI, Kenji c/o MITSUBISHI HITACHI POWER SYSTEMS, LTD. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa, 220-8401 / JP | 02 /
KODERA, Juichi c/o MITSUBISHI HITACHI POWER SYSTEMS, LTD. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa, 220-8401 / JP | 03 /
MIZUMI, Shunsuke c/o MITSUBISHI HITACHI POWER SYSTEMS, LTD. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa, 220-8401 / JP | 04 /
ISHIBASHI, Koji c/o MITSUBISHI HITACHI POWER SYSTEMS, LTD. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa, 220-8401 / JP | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2018/43] | Application number, filing date | 18168049.7 | 18.04.2018 | [2018/43] | Priority number, date | JP20170083510 | 20.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017083510 | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3392470 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3392470 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/00, F01D25/26 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
F01D21/003 (EP,US);
F01D25/285 (KR);
G06F30/20 (CN);
G05B19/4097 (US);
F01D25/243 (KR,US);
F01D25/26 (EP,US);
G01B21/32 (KR);
G06F30/17 (CN);
F05D2220/31 (US);
F05D2230/60 (KR,US);
F05D2240/14 (US);
F05D2240/24 (US);
F05D2260/81 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32359 (US);
G05B2219/35134 (US);
G05B2219/45055 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINER TURBINE, MONTAGEARBEITSUNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEM UND STEUERUNGSPROGRAMM | [2018/43] | English: | METHOD OF ASSEMBLING TURBINE, ASSEMBLY WORK SUPPORTING SYSTEM, AND CONTROL PROGRAM | [2018/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE DE TURBINE, SYSTÈME DE SUPPORT DE TRAVAIL D'ASSEMBLAGE ET PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE | [2018/43] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 18.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2018 | AL | 13.05.2020 | AT | 13.05.2020 | CY | 13.05.2020 | CZ | 13.05.2020 | DK | 13.05.2020 | EE | 13.05.2020 | ES | 13.05.2020 | FI | 13.05.2020 | HR | 13.05.2020 | IT | 13.05.2020 | LT | 13.05.2020 | LV | 13.05.2020 | MC | 13.05.2020 | NL | 13.05.2020 | PL | 13.05.2020 | RO | 13.05.2020 | RS | 13.05.2020 | SE | 13.05.2020 | SI | 13.05.2020 | SK | 13.05.2020 | SM | 13.05.2020 | BG | 13.08.2020 | NO | 13.08.2020 | GR | 14.08.2020 | PT | 14.09.2020 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 13.05.2020 | |
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 13.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0655385 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,11-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0039] *; | [X]US5627761 (POLLARD MICHAEL A [US]) [X] 1,4,11-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 1, line 17 * * column 3, line 20 - column 3, line 46 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 47 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 8 * * column 9, line 54 - column 9, line 62 * * column 10, line 8 - column 10, line 23 * * column 11, line 25 - column 12, line 15 * * column 12, line 44 - column 12, line 58 * * column 13, line 1 - column 13, line 6 * * column 13, line 18 - column 13, line 65 * * column 14, line 21 - column 14, line 41 *; | [X]JP2011089458 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,5,6,11,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0039] *; | [A]US2015167487 (WILLETT JR FRED THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract * | by applicant | JPH0367002 | JP2007032504 |