EP3573069 - ULTRASOUND DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM WITH MULTIMEDIA INFORMATION DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esaote S.p.A. Via Enrico Melen, 77 16152 Genova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | For all designated states Esaote S.p.A. via Enrico Melen, 77 16152 Genova / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Omero, Massimiliano Via Carlo Barabino 2/8 Scala 1 16129 GENOVA / IT | 02 /
Muraca, Luca Via Piacenza 85 B /15 16138 GENOVA / IT | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Karaghiosoff, Giorgio Alessandro c/o Praxi Intellectual Property S.p.A. - Savona Via F. Baracca 1R, 4° piano "Il Gabbiano" 17100 Savona / IT | [2019/48] | Application number, filing date | 18173410.4 | 21.05.2018 | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3573069 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G16H30/40, A61B8/00, G16H40/67 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
G16H30/40 (EP);
A61B8/565 (US);
A61B8/461 (EP);
A61B8/469 (US);
G16H40/67 (EP);
H04N21/2187 (US);
H04N21/23424 (US);
H04N21/2343 (US);
H04N21/23805 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] |
Former [2019/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLDIAGNOSESYSTEM MIT MULTIMEDIA-INFORMATIONSVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM | [2019/48] | English: | ULTRASOUND DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM WITH MULTIMEDIA INFORMATION DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM | [2019/48] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DIAGNOSTIC ULTRASONORE COMPORTANT UN SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION D'INFORMATIONS MULTIMÉDIA | [2019/48] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 19.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 03.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 03.09.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 03.09.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.09.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002172498 (ESENYAN HAYK [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * the whole document, especially paragraphs [0003]-[0040], [0063], [0071]-[0082], [0090]-[0105], [0111]-[0148], [0159], [0169]-[0226], and figures 1-25. * * figures 1-25 *; | [I]US2005251040 (RELKUNTWAR ANIL V [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * figure 9 * * page 2, paragraph 0028 - page 4, paragraph 0032 * * page 5, paragraph 0042 - page 9, paragraph 0064 * * page 12, paragraph 0087 - page 16, paragraph 0115 * * page 20, paragraph 0136 - paragraph 0138; figures 1-14 *; | [I]US2017249424 (AUGUSTO DI GRANDI NERY MARCELO [BR], et al) [I] 1-16 * the whole document, especially paragraphs [0001], [0007], [0009]-[0023], [0030]-[0037]; figures 1-5 *; | [I] - Anonymous, "Sonostream LIVE! - What is Sonostream?", (20170826), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20170826051751/http://www.sonostreamlive.net/sonostream.html, (20181109), XP055522700 [I] 1-16 * the whole document * | [I] - Anonymous, "Product Overview. Discover the fascinating world of PENTAX Medical endoscopy.", (20171209), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20171209044044if_/http://www.pentaxmedical.com:80/pentax/download/fstore/uploadFiles/Pdfs/Product%20Datasheets/EMEA_BRO_Productoverview_10.2014.pdf, (20181107), XP055522026 [I] 1-16 * the whole document * | [ ] - Anonymous, "Endoskopischer Ultraschall | PENTAX Medical (Germany)", (20171011), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20171011232845/https://www.pentaxmedical.com/pentax/de/101/2/EG-3870UTK-Ultrasound-Video-Endoscope, (20181107), XP055522027 [ ] * page 2 - page 3 * | [A] - David Austerberry, "What is streaming?", The Technology of Video and Audio Streaming, Taylor & Francis Group, (20041004), pages 7 - 8, ISBN 978-0-240-80580-1, XP055522368 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [ ] - David Austerberry, "7. Introduction to streaming media", The Technology of Video and Audio Streaming, Taylor & Francis Group, (20041004), pages 133 - 153, ISBN 978-0-240-80580-1, XP055524698 [ ] * the whole document, especially section "The streaming architecture" on pages 138-146. * | [ ] - David Austerberry, "8. Video encoding", The Technology of Video and Audio Streaming, Taylor & Francis Group, (20041004), pages 154 - 178, ISBN 978-0-240-80580-1, XP055524699 [ ] * the whole document * | [ ] - David Austerberry, "11. Stream serving", The Technology of Video and Audio Streaming, Taylor & Francis Group, (20041004), pages 209 - 232, ISBN 978-0-240-80580-1, XP055522367 [ ] * the whole document * |