EP3415757 - VARIABLE GEOMETRY LIFT VALVE FOR RECIPROCATING COMPRESSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2021/17] |
Former [2018/51] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALEOTTI, Leonardo Via Felice Matteucci 2 50127 Florence / IT | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater, et al Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/17] |
Former [2018/51] | Fischer, Michael Maria General Electric Technology GmbH Global Patent Operation - Europe Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 18177026.4 | 11.06.2018 | [2018/51] | Priority number, date | IT20170066770 | 15.06.2017 Original published format: IT201700066770 | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3415757 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3415757 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/10, F16K15/10, F16K15/12 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
F04B39/1053 (EP,US);
F16K17/06 (US);
F04B39/1013 (US);
F16K15/10 (EP,US);
F16K15/12 (EP,US);
F16K17/0413 (US);
F16K17/044 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/51] | F04B39/10, F16K15/08, F16K25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] |
Former [2018/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HUBVENTIL MIT VARIABLER GEOMETRIE FÜR KOLBENVERDICHTER | [2020/49] | English: | VARIABLE GEOMETRY LIFT VALVE FOR RECIPROCATING COMPRESSORS | [2018/51] | French: | SOUPAPE À GÉOMÉTRIE VARIABLE POUR COMPRESSEURS ALTERNATIFS | [2020/49] |
Former [2018/51] | HUBVENTIL MIT VARIABLER GEOMETRIE FÜR HUBKOLBENVERDICHTER | ||
Former [2018/51] | SOUPAPE DE LEVAGE À GÉOMÉTRIE VARIABLE DESTINÉ À DES COMPRESSEURS ALTERNATIFS | Examination procedure | 18.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 18.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2018 | AL | 28.04.2021 | CY | 28.04.2021 | CZ | 28.04.2021 | DK | 28.04.2021 | EE | 28.04.2021 | FI | 28.04.2021 | HR | 28.04.2021 | IT | 28.04.2021 | LT | 28.04.2021 | LV | 28.04.2021 | MC | 28.04.2021 | RO | 28.04.2021 | RS | 28.04.2021 | SE | 28.04.2021 | SI | 28.04.2021 | SK | 28.04.2021 | SM | 28.04.2021 | IE | 11.06.2021 | LU | 11.06.2021 | FR | 28.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | BG | 28.07.2021 | NO | 28.07.2021 | GR | 29.07.2021 | IS | 28.08.2021 | PT | 30.08.2021 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 11.06.2021 | ||
LU | 11.06.2021 | ||
FR | 28.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 11.06.2021 | ||
LU | 11.06.2021 | ||
FR | 28.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 11.06.2021 | ||
LU | 11.06.2021 | ||
FR | 28.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 11.06.2021 | ||
LU | 11.06.2021 | ||
FR | 28.06.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 11.06.2021 | ||
LU | 11.06.2021 | ||
FR | 28.06.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 28.04.2021 | |
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 11.06.2021 | ||
LU | 11.06.2021 | ||
FR | 28.06.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CZ | 28.04.2021 | |
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 11.06.2021 | ||
LU | 11.06.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | CZ | 28.04.2021 | |
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 11.06.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 28.04.2021 | |
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 28.04.2021 | |
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 28.04.2021 | |
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0314665 (HOERBIGER VENTILWERKE AG [AT]) [A] 1-15* column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 31; figures 1-3 *; | [XAI]US5100606 (WOOLLATT DEREK [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12,13,15 * column 8, lines 26-40; figures 2,3 * [A] 3-6,9,10,14 [I] 7,8,11; | [XAI]US2008230733 (SPIEGL BERNHARD [AT], et al) [X] 1,11-13 * paragraph [0018]; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-6,9,10,14 [I] 7,8; | [A]US2010090149 (THOMPSON GENE M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] , [0032]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2015044081 (BABBINI ALBERTO [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | US4869289 | by applicant | WO2013087615 | US9297373 |