EP3399447 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR A DISTRIBUTED DATABASE WITHIN A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swirlds, Inc. 3400 N Central Expwy, Ste. 470 Richardson, TX 75080 / US | [2020/47] |
Former [2019/44] | For all designated states Swirlds, Inc. 3400 N Central Expwy, Ste. 470 Richardson, TX 75080 / US | ||
Former [2018/45] | For all designated states Swirlds, Inc. 3348 General Pkwy College Station, Texas 77845 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAIRD, Leemon C., III 3400 N Central Expwy, Ste. 470 Richardson, TX 75080 / US | [2019/45] |
Former [2018/49] | 01 /
BAIRD, Leemon C., III 800 Southern Hills Ct. College Station, TX 77845 / US | ||
Former [2018/45] | 01 /
BAIRD, Leemon C., III 3348 General Pkwy College Station, TX Texas 77845 / US | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2020/47] |
Former [2018/45] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 18177124.7 | 26.08.2016 | [2018/45] | Priority number, date | US201562211411P | 28.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562211411 P | US201614988873 | 06.01.2016 Original published format: US201614988873 | US201615153011 | 12.05.2016 Original published format: US201615153011 | US201662344682P | 02.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662344682 P | US201615205688 | 08.07.2016 Original published format: US201615205688 | [2018/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3399447 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3399447 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/27, G06F9/54, G06F3/06, G06F7/00, G06F12/08 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
G06F16/27 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F16/2458 (CN);
G06F16/25 (RU);
G06F21/64 (EP);
G06Q20/065 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/45] | G06F17/30, G06F9/54, G06F3/06, G06F7/00, G06F12/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] |
Former [2018/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE VERTEILTE DATENBANK INNERHALB EINES NETZWERKS | [2018/45] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR A DISTRIBUTED DATABASE WITHIN A NETWORK | [2018/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR UNE BASE DE DONNÉES DISTRIBUÉE DANS UN RÉSEAU | [2018/45] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 07.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.06.2020 | 10.06.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16842700.3 / EP3341864 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.11.2020 | [2021/45] | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014012812 (ZUNGER YONATAN [US]) [X] 1,3,11 * figures 1A, 9, 11A * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0122] * [I] 2,4-10,12-15; | [XI] - Jae Kwon, "Tendermint: Consensus without Mining", (20150319), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20150319035333if_/http://tendermint.com:80/docs/tendermint.pdf, (20180719), XP055493960 [X] 1-3,11,12 * the whole document * [I] 4-10,13-15 | [A] - JOSEPH BONNEAU ET AL, "Research Perspectives and Challenges for Bitcoin and Cryptocurrencies", INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CRYPTOLOGIC RESEARCH,, (20150323), vol. 20150323:173252, doi:10.1109/SP.2015.14, pages 1 - 18, XP061018190 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SP.2015.14 | [L] - Jae Kwon, "Tendermint (capture)", (20150319), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20150319035333if_/http://tendermint.com:80/docs/tendermint.pdf, (20180719), XP055493977 [L] 1-15 |