EP3588226 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR GENERATING CONTROL COMMANDS FOR AN AUTONOMOUS ROAD VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zenuity AB Lindholmspiren 3 B 417 56 Göteborg / SE | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOHAMMADIHA, Nasser Mors Backe 3 414 67 GÖTEBORG / SE | 02 /
PANAHANDEH, Ghazaleh Mors Backe 3 414 67 GÖTEBORG / SE | 03 /
INNOCENTI, Christopher Beryllvägen 8 442 60 KODE / SE | 04 /
LINDÈN, Henrik Magnus Abergsgatan 15 46132 TROLLHÄTTAN / SE | [2020/24] |
Former [2020/01] | 01 /
MOHAMMADIHA, Nasser Mors Backe 3 414 67 GÖTEBORG / SE | ||
02 /
PANAHANDEH, Ghazaleh Mors Backe 3 414 67 GÖTEBORG / SE | |||
03 /
INNOCENTI, Christopher Beryllvägen 8 442 60 KODE / SE | |||
04 /
LINDÈN, Henrik Kullegatan 10A 412 62 GÖTEBORG / SE | Representative(s) | Bergenstråhle & Partners AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/01] | Bergenstråhle Group AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18180826.2 | 29.06.2018 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3588226 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3588226 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/00, G05D1/02, // B60W50/04 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
G05D1/0055 (EP);
B60W50/00 (EP,CN);
B60W60/0016 (US);
B60W50/04 (EP);
B60W60/0015 (EP);
G05D1/0221 (EP);
B60W2050/0028 (CN);
B60W2050/0034 (CN);
B60W2050/0088 (EP);
B60W2420/403 (EP,US);
B60W2420/408 (US);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
B60W2520/105 (EP);
B60W2552/00 (EP);
B60W2552/53 (EP,US);
B60W2554/00 (EP);
B60W2554/4041 (US);
B60W2555/60 (EP,US);
B60W2720/10 (CN);
B60W2720/106 (CN);
G05D1/0246 (US);
G05D1/027 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON STEUERBEFEHLEN FÜR EIN AUTONOMES STRASSENFAHRZEUG | [2020/01] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR GENERATING CONTROL COMMANDS FOR AN AUTONOMOUS ROAD VEHICLE | [2020/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR GÉNÉRER DES INSTRUCTIONS DE COMMANDE POUR UN VÉHICULE ROUTIER AUTONOME | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2018 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 19.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.05.2020 | 23.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2018 | AL | 24.06.2020 | AT | 24.06.2020 | CY | 24.06.2020 | CZ | 24.06.2020 | DK | 24.06.2020 | EE | 24.06.2020 | ES | 24.06.2020 | FI | 24.06.2020 | HR | 24.06.2020 | IT | 24.06.2020 | LT | 24.06.2020 | LV | 24.06.2020 | MC | 24.06.2020 | MK | 24.06.2020 | MT | 24.06.2020 | NL | 24.06.2020 | PL | 24.06.2020 | RO | 24.06.2020 | RS | 24.06.2020 | SI | 24.06.2020 | SK | 24.06.2020 | SM | 24.06.2020 | TR | 24.06.2020 | IE | 29.06.2020 | LU | 29.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | FR | 24.08.2020 | BG | 24.09.2020 | NO | 24.09.2020 | GR | 25.09.2020 | IS | 24.10.2020 | PT | 26.10.2020 | [2023/41] |
Former [2022/33] | HU | 29.06.2018 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
MK | 24.06.2020 | ||
MT | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
TR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IE | 29.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
FR | 24.08.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.06.2018 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
MT | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
TR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IE | 29.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
FR | 24.08.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
IE | 29.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
FR | 24.08.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
IE | 29.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
IE | 29.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 24.06.2020 | |
NO | 24.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]WO2017120336 (MOBILEYE VISION TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL], et al) [XD] 1,2,4-8,10-13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0074] - [0075] - [0126] , [0152] , [0174] - [0178] - [0255] - [0271]; figures 5C,5D,8 * [A] 3,9; | [I]WO2017155598 (KOOPMAN PHILIP [US]) [I] 1,2,4-8,10-12 * paragraphs [0004] - [0013] - [ 0074] - [0096]; figure 5 *; | [X]US2018120843 (BERNTORP KARL [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] - [0008] - [ 0012] - [0014] - [ 0018] , [0038] - [0052] - [ 000065]; figures 1D,1E *; | [A] - ANDREAS RESCHKA ET AL, "A surveillance and safety system based on performance criteria and functional degradation for an autonomous vehicle", INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS (ITSC), 2012 15TH INTERNATIONAL IEEE CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120916), doi:10.1109/ITSC.2012.6338682, ISBN 978-1-4673-3064-0, pages 237 - 242, XP032264014 [A] 1-13 * page 239 - page 241; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ITSC.2012.6338682 | by applicant | WO2017120336 | WO2017125209 | US2017357257 |