EP3428449 - DRIVETRAIN FOR A WIND TURBINE AND METHOD FOR POSITIONING A MAIN BEARING OF SAID DRIVETRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/03] | CLAMPING APPARATUS FOR POSITIONING A MAIN BEARING OF A WIND TURBINE DURING AN INSTALLATION AND/OR REPAIR PROCEDURE | ||
[2020/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANDERWALKER, Darrick Adam 2690 Balltown Rd Bldg 600 Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US | 02 /
EHERTS, Kevin Tyler 2690 Balltown Rd Bldg 600 Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [2020/36] |
Former [2019/03] | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18181923.6 | 05.07.2018 | [2019/03] | Priority number, date | US201715646208 | 11.07.2017 Original published format: US201715646208 | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3428449 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3428449 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F03D80/70, F03D80/50, F03D13/10 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
F03D13/10 (EP,US);
F03D80/50 (EP,US);
B23P6/002 (US);
F03D80/70 (EP,US);
F16C19/385 (US);
F16C35/06 (US);
F03D80/88 (US);
F05B2230/60 (EP,US);
F05B2230/604 (EP,US);
F05B2230/80 (EP,US);
F05B2240/50 (US);
F05B2240/57 (EP,US);
F05B2240/60 (EP,US);
F05B2260/30 (EP,US);
F05B2260/302 (EP,US);
F05B2260/507 (EP,US);
F05B2270/604 (EP,US);
F16C2360/31 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] |
Former [2019/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSTRANG FÜR EINE WINDKRAFTANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR POSITIONIERUNG EINES HAUPTLAGERS DES ANTRIEBSSTRANGS | [2020/07] | English: | DRIVETRAIN FOR A WIND TURBINE AND METHOD FOR POSITIONING A MAIN BEARING OF SAID DRIVETRAIN | [2020/07] | French: | TRAIN D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR UNE ÉOLIENNE ET PROCÉDÉ DE POSITIONNEMENT D'UN PALIER PRINCIPAL DUDIT TRAIN D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2020/07] |
Former [2019/03] | KLEMMVORRICHTUNG ZUM POSITIONIEREN EINES HAUPTLAGERS EINER WINDKRAFTANLAGE WÄHREND EINES INSTALLATIONS- UND/ODER REPARATURVORGANGS | ||
Former [2019/03] | CLAMPING APPARATUS FOR POSITIONING A MAIN BEARING OF A WIND TURBINE DURING AN INSTALLATION AND/OR REPAIR PROCEDURE | ||
Former [2019/03] | DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE POUR POSITIONNER UN PALIER PRINCIPAL D'UNE ÉOLIENNE AU COURS D'UNE PROCÉDURE D'INSTALLATION ET/OU DE RÉPARATION | Examination procedure | 16.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 16.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 25.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.07.2018 | AL | 02.09.2020 | AT | 02.09.2020 | CY | 02.09.2020 | CZ | 02.09.2020 | EE | 02.09.2020 | FI | 02.09.2020 | HR | 02.09.2020 | IT | 02.09.2020 | LT | 02.09.2020 | LV | 02.09.2020 | MC | 02.09.2020 | PL | 02.09.2020 | RO | 02.09.2020 | RS | 02.09.2020 | SE | 02.09.2020 | SI | 02.09.2020 | SK | 02.09.2020 | SM | 02.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | BG | 02.12.2020 | NO | 02.12.2020 | GR | 03.12.2020 | IS | 02.01.2021 | PT | 04.01.2021 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 02.09.2020 | |
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102005061498 (SKF AB [SE]) [X] 1-8,10-14 * paragraphs [0020] - [0028] * * figure - *; | [A]WO2010035011 (RICARDO UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]US2010098368 (VAN DER BEEK AUGUST [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,10-14 * paragraphs [0022] - [0026] * * figure - *; | [A]EP2233760 (SKF AB [SE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** figure - *; | [XY]US2011162174 (LIESEGANG HANS-JUERGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,10-14 * paragraphs [0032] - [0059] * * figure - * [Y] 9,15; | [Y]US2011188988 (WADEHN JORG [DK]) [Y] 9,15 * paragraphs [0046] - [0059] * * figure - * |